EP2746402 - Method of prognosis of Alzheimers disease and substrates for use therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Academisch Medisch Centrum Bureau Kennistransfer AMC TKs0-136 (De Rode Luifel) Meibergdreef 9 1105 AZ Amsterdam / NL | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | de Pauw, Elmar Sebastian David Schenklaan 5 2497 AV Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | de Pauw, Elmar Sebastian David Bureau Kennistransfer AMC TKs0-136 (De Rode Luifel) Meibergdreef 9 1105 AZ Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 13158742.0 | 12.03.2013 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2746402 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/37, C07K7/00 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
C12Q1/37 (EP);
C07K2319/50 (EP);
C07K2319/60 (EP);
G01N2800/2821 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Prognose von Morbus Alzheimer und Substrate zur Verwendung darin | [2014/26] | English: | Method of prognosis of Alzheimers disease and substrates for use therein | [2014/26] | French: | Procédé de pronostic de la maladie d'Alzheimer et substrats pour utilisation associée | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2013 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 22.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2015/15] | 01.11.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010233095 (DUAN D ROXANNE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0017] , [0029] , [0110] , [0124]; sequences 19-21 *; | [X]US2005164319 (FOURIE ANNE M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * abstract * * sequence 33 *; | [YD]EP1674580 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [YD] 1-9,11-15 * the whole document * * in particular * * paragraphs [0006] , [0056] - [0058] *; | [Y]US2011092445 (BARGHORN STEFAN [DE], et al) [Y] 2,7 * abstract * * sequence 970 *; | [X] - CHEN P T ET AL, "A highly sensitive peptide substrate for detecting two Abeta-degrading enzymes: Neprilysin and insulin-degrading enzyme", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHER B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 190, no. 1, ISSN 0165-0270, (20100630), pages 57 - 62, (20100625), XP027106838 [X] 1-3,8,11 * abstract * * page 58, column 1, paragraphs 2-3 * * page 59, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 60, column 2, paragraph 1 * | [Y] - LIU Z ET AL, "Characterization of insulin degrading enzyme and other amyloid-[beta] degrading proteases in human serum: A role in alzheimer's disease?", JOURNAL OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE, IOS PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20120101), vol. 29, no. 2, doi:10.3233/JAD-2011-111472, ISSN 1387-2877, pages 329 - 340, XP009171113 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 337, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 338, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 336, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3233/JAD-2011-111472 | [Y] - SUN X ET AL, "Catabolic attacks of membrane-bound angiotensin-converting enzyme on the N-terminal part of species-specific amyloid-beta peptides", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NL, vol. 588, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.EJPHAR.2008.03.058, ISSN 0014-2999, (20080624), pages 18 - 25, (20080406), XP022692137 [Y] 1 * abstract * * page 23, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2 * * table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejphar.2008.03.058 | [XP] - ANITA STARGARDT ET AL, "Reduced amyloid-[beta] degradation in early Alzheimer's disease but not in the APPswePS1dE9 and 3xTg-AD mouse models", AGING CELL, (20130623), vol. 12, no. 3, doi:10.1111/acel.12074, ISSN 1474-9718, pages 499 - 507, XP055071943 [XP] 1-9,11-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/acel.12074 | [I] - ZHAO ET AL, "Insulin degrading enzyme activity selectively decreases in the hippocampal formation of cases at high risk to develop Alzheimer's disease", NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING, TARRYTOWN, NY, US, (20070419), vol. 28, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.NEUROBIOLAGING.2006.05.001, ISSN 0197-4580, pages 824 - 830, XP022033032 [I] 10 * abstract * * Sections 2.1. and 2.3 on page 825 * * Section 3.3. on page 827 * * page 829, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neurobiolaging.2006.05.001 | [I] - PEREZ ADRIANA ET AL, "Degradation of soluble amyloid beta-peptides 1-40, 1-42, and the Dutch variant 1-40Q by insulin degrading enzyme from Alzheimer disease and control brains", NEUROCHEMICAL RESEARCH, (200002), vol. 25, no. 2, ISSN 0364-3190, pages 247 - 255, XP055078943 [I] 10 * abstract * * page 251, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 252, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 253, paragraph bridging columns 1 and 2 * | [Y] - COOK DAVID G ET AL, "Reduced hippocampal insulin-degrading enzyme in late-onset Alzheimer's disease is associated with the apolipoprotein E-epsilon4 allele", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY; [10640], AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR INVESTIGATIVE PATHOLOGY, US, (20030101), vol. 162, no. 1, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 313 - 319, XP009172465 [Y] 10 * abstract * * page 314, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 315, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9440(10)63822-9 | [A] - SUQING WANG ET AL, "Expression and functional profiling of neprilysin, insulin-degrading enzyme, and endothelin-converting enzyme in prospectively studied elderly and Alzheimer's brain", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (20101030), vol. 115, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1471-4159.2010.06899.x, ISSN 0022-3042, pages 47 - 57, XP055078957 [A] 10 * abstract * * page 52, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 54, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1471-4159.2010.06899.x | [A] - MINERS JAMES SCOTT ET AL, "Neprilysin and Insulin-Degrading Enzyme Levels Are Increased in Alzheimer Disease in Relation to Disease Severity", JOURNAL OF NEUROPATHOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, NEW YORK, NY, (20090801), vol. 68, no. 8, ISSN 0022-3069, pages 902 - 914, XP009172454 [A] 10 * abstract * * page 903, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 910, column 2, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/NEN.0b013e3181afe475 | by applicant | EP1674580 | - GOMEZ RAVETTI, M. ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2008), page 3E3111 | - SHAW, L. M. ET AL., ANN NEUROL, (2009), vol. 65, pages 403 - 13 | - N. ANDREASEN ET AL., ARCH NEUROL., (2001), vol. 58, pages 373 - 379 | - FORMICHI, P. ET AL., J. CELL. PHYSIOL., (2006), vol. 208, pages 39 - 46 | - LEWCZUK P ET AL., NEUROBIOL. AGING., (2004), vol. 25, pages 273 - 281 | - SUNDERLAND T. ET AL., JAMA, (2003), vol. 289, pages 2094 - 2103 | - BAILEY P., CAN. J. NEUROL. SCI., (2007), vol. 34, no. 1, pages S72 - S76 | - BLENNOW K., J. AM. SOC. EXP. NEUROTHERAPEUTICS., (2004), vol. 1, pages 213 - 225 | - KIM ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (20070316), vol. 282, no. 11, pages 7825 - 32 | - GLENNER; WONG, BIOCHEM BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1984), vol. 129, pages 885 - 890 | - GLENNER; WONG, BIOCHEM BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1984), vol. 122, no. 113, pages 1 - 1135 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - JAMES SCOTT MINERS; PATRICK GAVIN KEHOE; SETH LOVE, J OF NEUROSCIENCE METHODS, (20080330), vol. 169, no. 1, pages 177 - 181 | - BRAAK H; BRAAK E, "Neuropathological stageing of Alzheimer-related changes", ACTA NEUROPATHOL, (1991), vol. 82, pages 239 - 259 | - HUITINGA I; RADEMAKER M; KLIOUEVA N, "The art of brain banking in Europe: ethical, legal and practical guidelines for donor recruitment, tissue handling and tissue distribution", J NEURAL TRANSM, (2008), vol. 115, page 1715 | - JANKOWSKY JL; FADALE DJ; ANDERSON J; XU GM; GONZALES V; JENKINS NA; COPELAND NG; LEE MK; YOUNKIN LH; WAGNER SL, "Mutant presenilins specifically elevate the levels of the 42 residue p-amyloid peptide in vivo: evidence for augmentation of a 42-specific y secretase", HUMAN MOL GENET, (2004), vol. 13, pages 159 - 170 | - KAMPHUIS W; MAMBER C; MOETON M; KOOIJMAN L; SLUIJS JA; JANSEN AHP; VERVEER M; DE GROOT LR; SMITH VD; RANGARAJAN S, "GFAP Isoforms in Adult Mouse Brain with a Focus on Neurogenic Astrocytes and Reactive Astrogliosis in Mouse Models of Alzheimer Disease", PUBLIC LIBRARY OF SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 7, page E42823 | - KUROCHKIN IV; GOTO S, "Alzheimer's p-amyloid peptide specifically interacts with and is degraded by insulin degrading enzyme", FEBS LETT, (1994), vol. 345, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-5793(94)00387-4, pages 33 - 37, XP025890466 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(94)00387-4 | - REITS E; NEIJSSEN J; HERBERTS C; BENCKHUIJSEN W; JANSSEN L; DRIJFLIOUT JW; NEEFJES J, "A major role for TPPII in trimming proteasomal degradation products for MHC class I antigen presentation", IMMUNITY, (2004), vol. 20, pages 495 - 506 | - ROHER AE; ESH CL; KOKJOHN TA; CASTANO EM; VAN VICKLE GD; KALBACK WM; PATTON RL; LUEHRS DC; DAUGS ID; KUO Y, "Amyloid beta peptides in human plasma and tissues and their significance for Alzheimer's disease", ALZHEIMER'S AND DEMENTIA, (2009), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jalz.2008.10.004, pages 18 - 29, XP025846274 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jalz.2008.10.004 | - THINAKARAN G; KOO EH, "Amyloid precursor protein trafficking, processing, and function", J BIOL CHEM, (2008), vol. 283, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.R800019200, pages 29615 - 29619, XP055254030 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.R800019200 | - TJERNBERG LO; NASLUND J; LINDQVIST F; JOHANSSON J; KARLSTROM AR; THYBERG J; TERENIUS L; NORDSTEDT C, "Arrest of beta-amyloid fibril formation by a pentapeptide ligand", J BIOL CHEM, (1996), vol. 271, pages 8545 - 8548 |