blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2700756

EP2700756 - Device for hygienic flushing in a water installation and water installation comprising such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.10.2015
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.11.2015  [2015/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hans Sasserath GmbH & Co. KG.
Mühlenstrasse 62
41352 Korschenbroich / DE
[2014/39]
Former [2014/09]For all designated states
HANS SASSERATH & CO KG
Mühlenstrasse 62
41352 Korschenbroich / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hecking, Willi
An der Beeck 46
41372 Niederkrüchten-Elmpt / DE
 [2014/09]
Representative(s)Weisse, Renate
Bleibtreustraße 38
10623 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/09]Weisse, Renate
Patentanwälte Weisse & Wolgast Bleibtreustrasse 38
10623 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date13158827.912.03.2013
[2014/09]
Priority number, dateDE201220103128U20.08.2012         Original published format: DE 202012103128 U
[2014/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2700756
Date:26.02.2014
Language:DE
[2014/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.2013
ClassificationIPC:E03B7/08
[2014/09]
CPC:
E03B7/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Wasserarmatur zur Durchführung einer Hygienespülung in einer Wasserinstallation und Wasserinstallation mit einer solchen Wasserarmatur[2014/09]
English:Device for hygienic flushing in a water installation and water installation comprising such a device[2014/09]
French:Dispositif pour la réalisation d'un rinçage hygiénique dans une installation d'eau et l'installation comprenant un tel dispositif[2014/09]
Examination procedure07.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/09]
11.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/45]
01.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/45]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.04.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE202008002822U  (KEMPER GEBR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP2466019  (HONEYWELL TECHNOLOGIES SARL [CH]) [X] 1-3,9 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE202011105696U  (PAREDES BENJAMIN [DE]) [X] 1-3,9 * the whole document *
by applicantDE202008003055U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.