EP2642741 - Image reading device, apparatus including image reading device, image reading controlling method, and recording medium storing image reading control program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitai, Tadashi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Kaneko, Hitomi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Ishizaki, Hiroyoshi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
Kojima, Keiji c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
Kawamoto, Hiroyuki c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
Makino, Hideyo c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13159096.0 | 14.03.2013 | [2013/39] | Priority number, date | JP20120065258 | 22.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012065258 | JP20120285901 | 27.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012285901 | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2642741 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2642741 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04N1/191, H04N1/407, H04N1/60 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
H04N1/00045 (EP,US);
H04N1/00023 (US);
H04N1/00002 (US);
H04N1/4078 (EP,US);
H04N1/6036 (EP,US);
H04N1/6044 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/39] | H04N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildlesevorrichtung, Vorrichtung mit der Bildlesevorrichtung, Bildlesesteuerungsverfahren und Aufzeichnungsmedium mit darauf gespeichertem Bildlesesteuerungsprogramm | [2013/39] | English: | Image reading device, apparatus including image reading device, image reading controlling method, and recording medium storing image reading control program | [2013/39] | French: | Dispositif de lecture d'image, appareil comprenant un dispositif de lecture d'image, procédé de commande de lecture d'image et support d'enregistrement stockant un programme de commande de lecture d'image | [2013/39] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/21] | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP1239664 (RICOH KK [JP]) [I] 1,5,6,10 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-3,5-6 *[A] 2-4,7-9; | [IA]EP1343308 (XEROX CORP [US]) [I] 1,5,6,10 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0071]; figures 1-4,9 * [A] 2-4,7-9; | [XA]US2012044540 (DALAL EDUL N [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,10 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0088]; figures 1-3 * [A] 2-4,7-9 |