EP2693305 - Apparatus and method for selecting stylus location-determination information provided by a plurality of non-passive stylus-location modalities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Idzik, Jacek S. 295 Phillip Street Ext. 72407 Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | 02 /
Nandakumar, Rohan Michael 295 Phillip Street Ext. 77056 Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | 03 /
Mercea, Cornel 295 Phillip Street Ext. 73468 Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Noble, Nicholas Kilburn & Strode LLP Electronics 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13159142.2 | 14.03.2013 | [2014/06] | Priority number, date | EP20120178635 | 31.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12178635 | [2014/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2693305 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0354 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
G06F3/03545 (EP);
G06F2203/04106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Auswahl von Standortbestimmungsinformationen eines Eingabestifts durch eine Vielzahl von nicht-passiven Eingabestiftstandortmodalitäten | [2014/06] | English: | Apparatus and method for selecting stylus location-determination information provided by a plurality of non-passive stylus-location modalities | [2014/06] | French: | Appareil et procédé de sélection d'informations de détermination et d'emplacement de stylet fournies par une pluralité de modalités d'emplacement du stylet non-passives | [2014/06] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 28.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 31.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.06.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2011154950 (N TRIG LTD [IL]; GELLER ILAN [IL]; STERN YUVAL [IL]; KALMANOVICH ALEX) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 8, line 17 - page 9, line 18 * * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 5; figure 1 * * page 12, line 15 - line 22 * * page 14, line 29 - page 15, line 11; figure 2D * [Y] 4-15; | [X]US2009139778 (BUTLER DAVID ALEXANDER [GB] ET AL) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0067] *; | [Y]US6492979 (KENT JOEL [US] ET AL) [Y] 4-15 * abstract * * column 9, line 23 - line 63; figure 11 * |