EP2657727 - Light curtain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leuze electronic GmbH + Co KG In der Braike 1 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehmann, Joachim Kirchheimer Str. 2/4 73252 Lenningen / DE | 02 /
Patz, Jürgen Leuze electronic GmbH + Co. KG LOS Hohenneuffenstr. 47 72660 Beuren / DE | 03 /
Mück, Armin Übersbergweg 20 72124 Pliezhausen / DE | 04 /
Deutschmann, Martin Georg Deuschle Str. 51 73730 Esslingen / DE | 05 /
Schedlberger, Robert Marktplatz 26 4283 Bad Zell / AT | 06 /
Schönleitner, Arnold LOS Wintergasse 28/6 3002 Purkersdorf / AT | [2019/25] |
Former [2013/44] | 01 /
Lehmann, Joachim Kirchheimer Str. 2/4 73252 Lenningen / DE | ||
02 /
Patz, Jürgen Leuze electronic GmbH + Co. KG, LOS Hohenneuffenstr. 47 72660 Beuren / DE | |||
03 /
Mück, Armin Übersbergweg 20 72124 Pliezhausen / DE | |||
04 /
Deutschmann, Martin Georg Deuschle Str. 51 73730 Esslingen / DE | |||
05 /
Schedlberger, Robert Marktplatz 26 4283 Bad Zell / AT | |||
06 /
Schönleitner, Arnold LOS Wintergasse 28/6 3002 Purkersdorf / AT | Representative(s) | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwalt Jurastrasse 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | ||
Former [2013/44] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Fabrikstrasse 18 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | Application number, filing date | 13159321.2 | 15.03.2013 | [2013/44] | Priority number, date | DE201210103651 | 26.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012103651 | [2013/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2657727 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2657727 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/20, G01J1/02, // G01V8/22 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
G01V8/20 (EP);
G01J1/0271 (EP);
G01V8/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | G01V8/20 | Designated contracting states | DE [2019/34] |
Former [2013/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Lichtvorhang | [2013/44] | English: | Light curtain | [2013/44] | French: | Rideau lumineux | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 05.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]DE102007014170 (SICK AG [DE]) [I] 1-4,6-10 * figures 1-2c * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0013] , [0014] , [0027] , [0028] , [0033] - [0039] * [Y] 5; | [A]DE202007010492U (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-2e * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0028] - [0033] - [0036] - [0040] *; | [YA]US5013911 (KOSHIDA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 2, line 20 - line 50 * * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 14 * [A] 1-4,6-10; | [A]EP1933172 (LEUZE LUMIFLEX GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2,4 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0021] - [0029] - [0035] - [0038] - [0046] - [0050] * | Examination | US2011226938 | DE102005046478 | JP2007157556 | by applicant | DE202007010492U | US5013911 |