EP2650360 - Endocrine precursor cells, pancreatic hormone-expressing cells and methods of production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIACYTE, INC. 3550 General Atomics Court Building No 2-503 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2019/30] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states VIACYTE, INC. 3550 General Atomics Court Building No 2-503 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'Amour, Kevin 2739 East Evans Road San Diego, CA 92106 / US | 02 /
Bang, Anne 4273 Calle Isabelino San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
Baetge, Emmanuel E. 308 Sunset Drive 92024 Encinitas, CA / US | [2019/29] |
Former [2013/42] | 01 /
D'Amour, Kevin 2739 East Evans Road San Diego, CA 92106 / US | ||
02 /
Bang, Anne 4273 Calle Isabelino San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
03 /
Baetge, Emmanuel E. Ch. des Grandes Vignes 12 1025 St Sulpice / CH | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/30] |
Former [2013/42] | Lord, Hilton David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13159719.7 | 02.03.2007 | [2013/42] | Priority number, date | US20060778649P | 02.03.2006 Original published format: US 778649 P | US20060833633P | 26.07.2006 Original published format: US 833633 P | US20060852878P | 18.10.2006 Original published format: US 852878 P | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2650360 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2650360 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2650360 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/071, C12N5/0735 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
C12N5/0676 (EP,US);
A61K35/39 (US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
C12N5/0678 (EP,US);
C12N2500/38 (EP,US);
C12N2501/10 (EP,US);
C12N2501/105 (EP,US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2501/119 (EP,US);
C12N2501/12 (EP,US);
C12N2501/15 (US);
C12N2501/16 (EP,US);
C12N2501/33 (EP,US);
C12N2501/335 (US);
C12N2501/385 (EP,US);
C12N2501/41 (EP,US);
C12N2501/415 (EP,US);
C12N2501/42 (EP,US);
C12N2501/58 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/30] |
Former [2013/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Endokrine Vorläuferzellen, pankreashormon-exprimierende Zellen und Herstellungsverfahren | [2013/42] | English: | Endocrine precursor cells, pancreatic hormone-expressing cells and methods of production | [2013/42] | French: | Cellules précurseurs endocrines, cellules exprimant des hormones pancréatiques et procédés de production | [2013/42] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.01.2019 | 21.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07752255.5 / EP1999253 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070752255) is 08.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2007 | AT | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | CZ | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | ES | 24.07.2019 | FI | 24.07.2019 | IT | 24.07.2019 | LT | 24.07.2019 | LV | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | MT | 24.07.2019 | PL | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | TR | 24.07.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | GR | 25.10.2019 | IS | 24.11.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | IE | 02.03.2020 | LU | 02.03.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/08] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IE | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
LU | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 24.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03050249 (GERON CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,10-13 * examples 3-6 * * page 17, paragraph 3 * [I] 2,3,6,9; | [AD]WO2005116073 (NOVOCELL INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2006083782 (ES CELL INT PTE LTD [SG], et al) [XP] 8,10-12 * page 64 - page 66; figures 18,19,23; example 11 *; | [XI] - SEGEV HANNA ET AL, "Differentiation of human embryonic stem cells into insulin-producing clusters.", STEM CELLS (DAYTON, OHIO) 2004, (2004), vol. 22, no. 3, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 265 - 274, XP009038283 [X] 1-5,8-12 * figure 2 * * figure 3 * * page 269, column R, paragraph 2 - page 270, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 269, column L, paragraph 3 * [I] 6,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.22-3-265 | [A] - SHI YAN ET AL, "Inducing embryonic stem cells to differentiate into pancreatic beta cells by a novel three-step approach with activin A and all-trans retinoic acid.", STEM CELLS (DAYTON, OHIO) MAY 2005, (200505), vol. 23, no. 5, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 656 - 662, XP008059753 [A] 1-13 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2004-0241 | [A] - MURTAUGH L CHARLES ET AL, "Notch signaling controls multiple steps of pancreatic differentiation.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 9 DEC 2003, (20031209), vol. 100, no. 25, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 14920 - 14925, XP002452671 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.2436557100 | [XP] - D'AMOUR KEVIN A ET AL, "Production of pancreatic hormone-expressing endocrine cells from human embryonic stem cells.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY NOV 2006, (200611), vol. 24, no. 11, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1392 - 1401, XP002423119 [XP] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1259 | [XP] - MADSEN O D ET AL, "Towards cell therapy for diabetes", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY 2006 UNITED STATES, (2006), vol. 24, no. 12, pages 1481 - 1483, XP002452672 [XP] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1206-1481 | Examination | WO03046141 | - CARPENTER M K ET AL, "Enrichment of neurons and neural precursors from human embryonic stem cells.", EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY DEC 2001, (200112), vol. 172, no. 2, ISSN 0014-4886, pages 383 - 397 | - DEVASKAR S U ET AL, "Insulin gene expression and insulin synthesis in mammalian neuronal cells.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 18 MAR 1994, (19940318), vol. 269, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 8445 - 8454 | - GANNON M ET AL, "Analysis of the Cre-mediated recombination driven by rat insulin promoter in embryonic and adult mouse pancreas.", GENESIS (NEW YORK, N.Y. : 2000) FEB 2000, (200002), vol. 26, no. 2, ISSN 1526-954X, pages 139 - 142 | - HORI YUICHI ET AL, "Differentiation of insulin-producing cells from human neural progenitor cells.", PLOS MEDICINE APR 2005, (200504), vol. 2, no. 4, ISSN 1549-1676, page e103 | - DOTTORI MIRELLA ET AL, "Neural differentiation of human embryonic stem cells.", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY (CLIFTON, N.J.) 2008, (2008), vol. 438, ISSN 1064-3745, pages 19 - 30 | - DRUCKER D J ET AL, "Glucagon gene expression in vertebrate brain.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 25 SEP 1988, (19880925), vol. 263, no. 27, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 13475 - 13478 | - FRANCESCO PANZA ET AL, "REVIEW: [gamma]-Secretase Inhibitors for the Treatment of Alzheimer's Disease: The Current State : Secretase-Based Drugs in Alzheimer's Disease", CNS NEUROSCIENCE & THERAPEUTICS, GB, (20101001), vol. 16, no. 5, doi:10.1111/j.1755-5949.2010.00164.x, ISSN 1755-5930, pages 272 - 284, XP055470265 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1755-5949.2010.00164.x | by applicant | US5453357 | US5670372 | US5690926 | US5843780 | US6090622 | US6200806 | US6251671 | US2002072117 | US2003175956 | US2003190748 | US2004229350 | - D'AMOUR ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2005), vol. 23, pages 1534 - 1541 | - BOCIAN-SOBKOWSKA, J. ET AL., HISTOCHEM.CELL BIOL., (1999), vol. 112, pages 147 - 153 | - RAHIER J. ET AL., CELL TISSUE RES., (1979), vol. 200, no. 3, pages 359 - 366 | - MALAISSE-LANGAE F. ET AL., DIABETOLOGIA, (1979), vol. 17, no. 6, pages 361 - 365 | - FIOCCA R. ET AL., HISTOCHEMISTRY, (1983), vol. 77, no. 4, pages 511 - 523 | - STEFAN Y. ET AL., DIABETOLOGICA, (1982), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 141 - 142 | - KELLY, O.G.; MELTON, D. A., DEV. DYN., (2000), vol. 218, pages 615 - 627 | - CHEN, Y. ET AL., DEV. BIOL., (2004), vol. 271, no. 1, pages 144 - 160 | - FIELD, H.A. ET AL., DEV. BIOL., (2003), vol. 263, pages 197 - 208 | - SPOONER, B.S. ET AL., J. CELL BIOLOGY, (1970), vol. 47, no. 23, pages 5 - 246 | - LI, H. ET AL., NATURE, (1999), vol. 23, pages 67 - 70 | - RONN, L., EUR J NEUROSCI., (2002), vol. 16, pages 1720 - 30 | - SRIKANTA ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1987), vol. 120, pages 2240 - 2244 | - D'AMOUR, K. ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, pages 1534 - 1541 | - D'AMOUR, K. ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOG, (2005), vol. 23, pages 1534 - 1541 | - D'AMOUR, K., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, pages 1534 - 1541 | - D'AMOUR, K ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, pages 1534 - 1541 | - D'AMOUR, K. ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 1534 - 1541 | - JOANNIDES ET AL., STEM CELLS, (2006), vol. 24, pages 230 - 235 | - BOCIAN-SOBKOWSKA, J. ET AL., HISTOCHEM. CELL BIOL., (1999), vol. 112, pages 147 - 153 | - SPOONER, B.S. ET AL., J. CELL BIOLOGY, (1970), vol. 47, pages 235 - 246 | - STAFFORD, D.; PRINCE, CURR. BIOL., (2002), vol. 12, pages 1 - 20 | - MORIYA, N. ET AL., DEVELOP. GROWTH DIFFER., (2000), vol. 42, pages 175 - 185 | - CHEN, Y., DEV. BIOL., (2004), vol. 271, pages 144 - 160 | - STAFFORD, D. ET AL., DEVELOPMENT, (2006), vol. 133, no. 5, pages 949 - 956 | - MOLOTKOV, A., DEVEL. DYN., (2005), vol. 232, pages 950 - 957 | - GAO, R. ET AL., DIABELTOLOGIA, (2005), vol. 48, pages 2296 - 2304 | - RONN, L. ET AL., EUR J NEUROSCI., (2002), vol. 16, no. 9, pages 1720 - 30 | US20040021618 | US20050165305 | US20050730917 | US20050736598 |