Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
11.04.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
26.01.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.11.2018 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
02.11.2018 | First examination report | |
26.01.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.02.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.01.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.01.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.02.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
02.07.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] |
31.05.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] |
29.03.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |