EP2610309 - Polycarbonate resin composition and formed product thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ENGINEERING-PLASTICS CORPORATION Shiodome Sumitomo-Bldg. 25F, 9-2 Higashi-shinbashi 1-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0021 / JP | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monden, Toshiki MITSUBISHI ENGINEERING-PLASTICS CORPORATION 6-2, Hisgashihachiman 5-chome, Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa, 254-0016 / JP | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13161062.8 | 07.01.2010 | [2013/27] | Priority number, date | JP20090026837 | 09.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009026837 | JP20090055802 | 10.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009055802 | JP20090075456 | 26.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009075456 | JP20090102103 | 20.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009102103 | JP20090102104 | 20.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009102104 | JP20090103168 | 21.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009103168 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2610309 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
C08K5/42 (EP,US);
C08K5/549 (US);
C08K5/5419 (US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08G77/60 (EP,US);
C08L27/12 (EP,US);
C08L83/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L69/00, C08L83/00 (EP,US);
C08L83/00, C08L69/00 (US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | Polycarbonatharzzusammensetzung und daraus geformtes Produkt | [2013/27] | English: | Polycarbonate resin composition and formed product thereof | [2013/27] | French: | Composition de résine polycarbonate et produit formé à partir de celle-ci | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 11.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/34] | 12.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10738387.9 / EP2395052 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100738387) is 11.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2001018486 (LICHTENHAN JOSEPH D [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0014] , [0026] - [0027]; example 1 *; | [Y]US6433050 (SHINOMIYA TADASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 5, line 63 - column 7, line 65; tables 2-13 *; | [XY]US2005286397 (INAGAKI YASUHITO [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7,10 * paragraphs [0080] - [0088] - [0094]; example 5; table 1 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, POLYCARBOSILANES, ENCYCLOPEDIA OF POLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, WILEY, GB, PAGE(S) 426 - 439, (20010101), XP007920491 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/0471440264.pst428 | by applicant | JPS4740445B | JPS5432456B | JPS6260421B | JPH08245782 | JPH08259687 | JP2719486B | JP2746519B | JPH11181265 | JPH11217494 | JPH11263903 | JP2000169696 | JP2000239509 | JP3163596B | JP2001181493 | JP3240972B | JP2003268247 | JP2003277617 | JP2003277756 | JP2003531940 | JP3503095B | JP2004524423 | JP2005232442 | JP3716754B | JP2006199861 | JP3835497B | JP2007131692 | - R. D. MILLER; J. MICHL, CHEMICAL REVIEW, (1989), vol. 89, page 1359 | - N. MATSUMOTO, JAPANESE JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, (1998), vol. 37, page 5425 |