EP2647532 - Jack system and jack control element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/41] | Car jack element, jack system and jack control element | ||
[2020/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOBEK Motorsporttechnik GmbH & Co. KG Badener Straße 8 69493 Hirschberg / DE | [2020/04] |
Former [2019/12] | For all designated states SOBEK Motorsporttechnik GmbH & Co. KG Industriestraße 8 68542 Heddesheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 41550 Göteborg / SE | ||
For all designated states Sobek Motorsporttechnik GmbH & Co. KG Industriestraße 8 68542 Heddesheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benoit, Laurent La Fruitière 73800 La Chavanne / FR | 02 /
Fucks, Thomas Rosenweg 2 Röthlein 97520 / DE | 03 /
Hahn, Olaf Maifischweg 23 68549 Ilvesheim / DE | 04 /
Stöckl, Peter Ringstr. 32a 67240 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Leckel, Ulf Leckel-Patentanwaltskanzlei Speyerer Straße 6 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/20] | Leckel, Ulf LECKEL Patentanwaltskanzlei Postfach 12 11 22 68062 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/41] | Schonecke, Mitja SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Straße 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 13161213.7 | 27.03.2013 | [2013/41] | Priority number, date | DE201210205575 | 04.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012205575 | [2013/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2647532 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2647532 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2647532 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60S9/02, B60S9/08 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
B60S9/02 (EP);
B60S9/04 (EP);
B60S9/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/41] | B60S9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2020/20] |
Former [2013/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Wagenhebersystem und Wagenheberbedienelement | [2020/02] | English: | Jack system and jack control element | [2020/02] | French: | Système de cric et élément de commande de cric | [2020/02] |
Former [2013/41] | Wagenheberelement, Wagenhebersystem und Wagenheberbedienelement | ||
Former [2013/41] | Car jack element, jack system and jack control element | ||
Former [2013/41] | Elément de cric, système de cric et élément de commande de cric | Examination procedure | 27.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 10.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005003014 (RV SAFETY PRODUCTS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 8, line 1 - page 10, line 12; figures 1,2a,2b,3a-3c,4 *; | [X]US2006043352 (SINGH GURBAKHASH [IN], et al) [X] 1,7-11* figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2010176359 (WISNER CRAIG [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-5a * |