EP2648017 - On-board system for piloting an aircraft, based on a GNSS system, with redundant, dissimilar architecture for high level of integrity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 45, rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly Sur Seine / FR | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rollet, Stéphane 16, rue Camille Saint-Saens 26120 Chabeuil / FR | 02 /
Arethens, Jean-Pierre Ancienne Ecole - "Quartier Perrots" 26760 Beaumont-les-Valence / FR | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Hammes, Pierre, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Hammes, Pierre, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13161627.8 | 28.03.2013 | [2013/41] | Priority number, date | FR20120001028 | 06.04.2012 Original published format: FR 1201028 | [2013/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2648017 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2648017 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/15, G01S19/20, G08G5/02 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
G01S19/39 (EP,RU,US);
G01C21/165 (EP,RU,US);
G01C21/20 (RU,US);
G01S19/15 (EP,US);
G01S19/20 (EP,US);
G05D1/042 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Title | German: | Bordsystem zur Unterstützung der Steuerung eines Luftschiffs, das auf einem GNSS-System mit redundanter und ungleichartiger Architektur für ein hohes Integritätsniveau beruht | [2013/41] | English: | On-board system for piloting an aircraft, based on a GNSS system, with redundant, dissimilar architecture for high level of integrity | [2013/41] | French: | Système embarqué d'aide au pilotage d'un aéronef, basé sur un système GNSS, à architecture redondante et dissimilaire pour niveau d'integrité élevé | [2013/41] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 05.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2013 | AL | 24.09.2014 | AT | 24.09.2014 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | DK | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | ES | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | HR | 24.09.2014 | LT | 24.09.2014 | LV | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | MK | 24.09.2014 | MT | 24.09.2014 | NL | 24.09.2014 | PL | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | RS | 24.09.2014 | SE | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | SM | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | NO | 24.12.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | IS | 24.01.2015 | PT | 26.01.2015 | IE | 28.03.2015 | LU | 28.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 28.03.2013 | |
AT | 24.09.2014 | ||
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MK | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
SM | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 28.03.2015 | ||
LU | 28.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 28.03.2013 | |
AT | 24.09.2014 | ||
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 28.03.2015 | ||
LU | 28.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 28.03.2015 | ||
LU | 28.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 28.03.2015 | ||
LU | 28.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 28.03.2015 | ||
LU | 28.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 28.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 24.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9602905 (WORLDWIDE NOTIFIC SYST [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 8, line 14 - page 10, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]US5945943 (KALAFUS RUDOLPH M [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 9, line 8 - column 11, line 2; figures 3A,4B *; | [A] - TROMBONI P D ET AL, "Experiences in Data Analysis of a GBAS Approach Test", AEROSPACE CONFERENCE, 2007 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070303), ISBN 978-1-4244-0524-4, pages 1 - 9, XP031214137 [A] 1 * Table 2 - 3; page 4 * |