EP2611159 - Method and apparatus for image encoding and image decoding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sohn, Yu-Mi 503-1005 Tap Maeul Ssangyong Apt, Yatap-dong, Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Han, Woo-Jin 102-1104 Acropark Apt, 296-6 Woncheon-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Clark, David James Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13161879.5 | 10.01.2008 | [2013/27] | Priority number, date | KR20070028886 | 23.03.2007 Original published format: KR 20070028886 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611159 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/36, H04N7/34 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
H04N19/105 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/109 (EP,US);
H04N19/11 (EP,US);
H04N19/122 (EP,US);
H04N19/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/169 (EP,US);
H04N19/50 (EP,US);
H04N19/523 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bildcodierung und Bilddecodierung | [2013/27] | English: | Method and apparatus for image encoding and image decoding | [2013/27] | French: | Procédé et appareil destinés à coder et décoder une image | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 07.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.03.2021 | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/27] | 04.03.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/27] | 15.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08704690.0 / EP2127380 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080704690) is 25.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007065026 (LEE YUNG-LYUL [KR], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0041] * * figures 1, 4, 5 *; | [X]US2006146930 (KIM WOOSHIK [KR], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056] * * figures 1, 2, 4 *; | [A]EP1569461 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0112] * | [X] - Y-L LEE, "Lossless intra coding for improved 4:4:4", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20050719), no. JVT-P016, XP030006058 [X] 1-11 * Section 1 * * Section 2.2 (A and B) * * Section 5 * |