EP2649935 - Evaluation method, evaluation device, program, and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazaki, Jungo c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA; 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
Ichimura, Yoshikatsu c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA; 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
Otsu, Ryuichi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA; 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2013/42] | Application number, filing date | 13162286.2 | 04.04.2013 | [2013/42] | Priority number, date | JP20120091279 | 12.04.2012 Original published format: JP 2012091279 | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2649935 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0484, A61B5/16 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
A61B5/4884 (EP,US);
A61B5/14553 (EP,US);
A61B5/165 (EP);
A61B5/378 (EP,US);
A61B5/4023 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/42] | A61B5/0484 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bewertungsverfahren, Bewertungsvorrichtung, Programm und Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2013/42] | English: | Evaluation method, evaluation device, program, and recording medium | [2013/42] | French: | Procédé d'évaluation, dispositif d'évaluation, programme et support d'enregistrement | [2013/42] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | - IIJIMA, ATSUHIKO ET AL., "Cerebral blood flow and subjective score during visually induced motion sickness", 23RD BPES SYMPOSIUM ON BIOLOGICAL AND PHYSIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING, (2008), pages 11 - 12 | - S. A. ENGEL; G. H. GLOVER; B. A. WANDELL, "Retinotopic organization in human visual cortex and the spatial precision of functional MRI", CEREBRAL CORTEX, (199707), pages 181 - 192 |