Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
04.05.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.03.2018 | Change - classification | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
09.03.2018 | Change - classification | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
05.05.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.03.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.05.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.10.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |