EP2659854 - Surgical tool having positively positionable tendon-actuated multi-disk wrist joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2017/37] | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | ||
Former [2013/45] | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1266 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooper, Thomas, G. 304 Concord Drive Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US | 02 /
Chang, Stacey 815 Selkirk Place Sunnyvale, CA California 94087 / US | 03 /
Anderson, Christopher, S. 371 Prospect Street Northampton, MA Massachusetts 01060 / US | 04 /
Williams, Dustin 200 East Dana Street, Apt. E114 Mountain View, CA California 94041 / US | 05 /
Manzo, Scott 272 East Village Road Shelton, CT Connecticut 06484 / US | 06 /
Wallace, Daniel, T. 621 Glenloch Way Redwood City, CA California 94062 / US | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2013/45] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13162796.0 | 01.07.2002 | [2013/45] | Priority number, date | US20010301967P | 29.06.2001 Original published format: US 301967 P | US20010327702P | 05.10.2001 Original published format: US 327702 P | US20020187248 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: US 187248 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2659854 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2659854 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2659854 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, A61B17/29, A61B1/00, A61B34/00, // A61B1/005, A61B1/008 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B34/71 (EP,US);
A61B34/72 (EP,US);
A61B1/0055 (EP,US);
A61B1/0057 (EP,US);
A61B1/008 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00314 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0069 (US);
A61B2017/2908 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2929 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2936 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/45] | A61B19/00, A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2018/06] |
Former [2013/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgisches Werkzeug mit positiv positionierbarem sehnenaktiviertem Mehrscheiben-Handgelenk | [2013/45] | English: | Surgical tool having positively positionable tendon-actuated multi-disk wrist joint | [2013/45] | French: | Outil chirurgical doté d'une articulation de poignée multidisques positionnable actionnée par tendon | [2020/16] |
Former [2013/45] | Outil chirurgical doté dýune articulation de poignée multidisques positionnable actionnée par tendon | Examination procedure | 08.04.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 07.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02748026.8 / EP1585425 | Divisional application(s) | EP19164807.0 / EP3524201 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020748026) is 06.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | DK | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | ES | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | IT | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | NL | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | TR | 15.04.2020 | IE | 01.07.2020 | LU | 01.07.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | GB | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | FR | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GB | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GB | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
FR | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GB | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 15.04.2020 | |
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4919382 (FORMAN DONALD B [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 24; figure 1 * [I] 4,5,10; | [A]US5619195 (ALLEN CLAY D [US], et al) [A] 10 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5916146 (ALLOTTA BENEDETTO [IT], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 4, line 6 - line 24; figure 4 ** column 6, line 1 - line 31; figures 7-9 * |