EP2650701 - System and method for measuring and storing meteorological data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cube Engineering GmbH Breitscheidstrasse 6 34119 Kassel / DE | [2013/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chun, Stefan Parkstrasse 60 34119 Kassel / DE | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 13163399.2 | 11.04.2013 | [2013/42] | Priority number, date | DE201210103108 | 11.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012103108 | [2013/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2650701 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2650701 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01W1/00, G01W1/02 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
G01W1/00 (EP);
G01W2001/006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/42] | G01W1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Messung und Speicherung meteorologischer Daten | [2013/42] | English: | System and method for measuring and storing meteorological data | [2013/42] | French: | Système et procédé de mesure et de stockage de données météorologiques | [2013/42] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102007041018 (VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-11,13,15 * the whole document * [I] 3,6-8,12,14; | [XI]DE19614785 (SCHULZE STEPHAN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,11,15 * the whole document * [I] 3,6-8,10,12-14 |