Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011015072 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08172145 | 18.12.2008 | EP08152581 | 11.03.2008 | WO2009EP52744 | 09.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5508291B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2014 | B2 | JP2011514841 | 12.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08172145 | 18.12.2008 | EP08152581 | 11.03.2008 | WO2009EP52744 | 09.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2254694 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08172145 | 18.12.2008 | EP08152581 | 11.03.2008 | WO2009EP52744 | 09.03.2009 | EP09718647 | 09.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2628530 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08172145 | 18.12.2008 | EP08152581 | 11.03.2008 | EP13163493 | 09.03.2009 | EP09718647 | 09.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0909354 | 24.09.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08172145 | 18.12.2008 | EP08152581 | 11.03.2008 | WO2009EP52744 | 09.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2716917 | 17.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08172145 | 18.12.2008 | EP08152581 | 11.03.2008 | WO2009EP52744 | 09.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101970097B | 17.07.2013 | B | CN101970097 | 09.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08172145 | 18.12.2008 | EP08152581 | 11.03.2008 | WO2009EP52744 | 09.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009112467 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08172145 | 18.12.2008 | EP08152581 | 11.03.2008 | Type | Earlier application | EP2254694 |