EP2628530 - Microcapsules with walls formed of acylurea [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hechavarria Fonseca, Maria Teresa Nibelungenstr. 40 68642 Bürstadt / DE | 02 /
Jung, Marc Rudolf In den Neunmorgen 4 67551 Worms / DE | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 13163493.3 | 09.03.2009 | [2013/34] | Priority number, date | EP20080152581 | 11.03.2008 Original published format: EP 08152581 | EP20080172145 | 18.12.2008 Original published format: EP 08172145 | [2013/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2628530 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/16, A01N25/28, A23L1/22, C09B67/02, C11D3/50, F28D20/02 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
B01J13/16 (EP,US);
A01N25/28 (EP,US);
A23L27/72 (EP,US);
C09B67/0097 (EP,US);
F28D20/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/34] | Title | German: | Mikrokapseln mit Wänden aus Acylharnstoff | [2013/34] | English: | Microcapsules with walls formed of acylurea | [2013/34] | French: | Microcapsules dotées de parois en acylurée | [2013/34] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/14] | 17.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09718647.2 / EP2254694 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090718647) is 08.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]BE841648 ; | [XI]DE2523586 (BAYER AG); | [XI]US4120518 (BAATZ GUNTHER, et al); | [XI]GB1529517 (BAYER AG); | [A]WO0144334 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2005129946 (HAYASHI MASAKI [JP]); | [AP]DE102007055813 (BASF SE [DE]); | [AP]WO2008077766 (BASF SE [DE], et al) | by applicant | DD981576T | DE1101394 | DE1130594 | DE1156401 | GB1083410 | DE1453543 | DE1568017 | DE1931055 | DE2619524 | US4195110 | US4394411 | US4810569 | US5108654 | GB2250930 | DE4318979 | US5456852 | WO9534609 | EP0712240 | DE19623413 | US5955188 | WO0149817 | US2002054964 | EP1421243 | DE102004059977 | WO2006018130 | WO2006092409 | DE102007055813 | DE19782839133 |