EP2650674 - Method to control the printing of a pattern printed on a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS ITALIA S.R.L. Via Postumia Ovest 244 Frazione Olmi 31048 San Biagio di Callalta (TV) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS ITALIA S.R.L. Via Postumia Ovest 244 frazioni OLMI 31048 San Biagio di Callalta (TV) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boscolo, Enrico Marchi Via Eridano, 3 30015 Chioggia Venice / IT | 02 /
Vercesi, Tommaso Hanauer Str. 41d 63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | 03 /
Romanello, Alberto Via Codalunga 23/A 31030 Mignagola di Carbonera TV / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | 01 /
Boscolo, Enrico Marchi Via Eridano, 3 30015 Chioggia Venice / IT | ||
02 /
Vercesi, Tommaso Via Lombardia, 13/2 31057 Silea / IT | |||
03 /
Romanello, Alberto Via Codalunga 23/A 31030 Mignagola di Carbonera TV / IT | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13163502.1 | 12.04.2013 | [2013/42] | Priority number, date | IT2012UD00061 | 13.04.2012 Original published format: IT UD20120061 | US201261698141P | 07.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261698141 P | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2650674 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/95, G01N21/956, // G01N21/93, H01L31/0224 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
G01N21/9501 (EP);
G01N21/95607 (EP);
H01L21/67736 (EP);
H01L21/6776 (EP);
H01L31/022425 (EP);
H01L31/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung des Druckens von einer auf einem Substrat gedruckten Struktur | [2013/42] | English: | Method to control the printing of a pattern printed on a substrate | [2013/42] | French: | Procédé pour commander l'impression d'un motif imprimé sur un substrat | [2013/42] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP2562000 (APPLIED MATERIALS ITALIA SRL [IT]) [XP] 1-3,7,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0012] , [0036] , [0039] , [0040] , [0042] , [0044] , [0045] , [0047] , [0051] * * paragraphs [0052] , [0055] , [0060] , [0062] , [0063] , [0075] , [0080] , [0081] , [0094] *; | [XI]US2006044378 (KIM DAE-JUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-7,13,14 * paragraphs [0005] , [0010] , [0024] , [0034] , [0038] - [0040] - [0042] , [0043] , [0044] , [0049] , [0050] * [I] 8-12; | [I]US6721461 (NICHANI SANJAY [US]) [I] 1-14 * column 1, lines 24-49 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 17 * * column 2, lines 32-55 * * column 3, lines 8-22, 30-42 * * column 6, lines 19-33 * * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 15 * * column 8, lines 19-28 * * column 9, lines 44-48 * * column 13, lines 17-34 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US6219442 (HARPER BENNY MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 9-12 * column 4, lines 39-50; figure 4 * * column 5, lines 43-62 *; | [A]DE102007003224 (THIEME GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,13 * paragraphs [0059] , [0064] *; | [A]WO2011000442 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,13 * paragraphs [0021] , [0026]; figure 1 * |