Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9541222 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2017 | B2 | US2013277962 | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213449608 | 18.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2653764 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2015 | B1 | EP2653764 | 09.07.2014 | A3 | EP2653764 | 23.10.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213449608 | 18.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2561165T | 24.02.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201213449608 | 18.04.2012 |