EP2664964 - Display/input device and image forming apparatus including display/input device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Document Solutions Inc. 1-2-28, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nitta, Ryuichi c/o KYOCERA Document Solutions Inc. 1-2-28, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13164057.5 | 17.04.2013 | [2013/47] | Priority number, date | JP20120100082 | 25.04.2012 Original published format: JP 2012100082 | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2664964 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
G03G15/502 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anzeige-/eingabevorrichtung und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung mit Anzeige-/eingabevorrichtung | [2013/47] | English: | Display/input device and image forming apparatus including display/input device | [2013/47] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage/entrée et appareil de formation d'image comprenant un dispositif d'affichage/entrée | [2013/47] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 26.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006015811 (TANAKA KEI [JP], et al) [I] 1,4,7,11,13 * paragraphs [0037] - [0077]; figure 2 *; | [I]US2011069356 (YOSHIDA HIROYOSHI [JP]) [I] 1,4,10-13* paragraphs [0038] - [0055]; figures 1-6 *; | [I]WO2011108743 (RICOH CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1,4,7,8,11-13 * page 1, line 143 - page 3, line 2; figures 1-25 * * page 12, line 9 - page 14, line 12 *; | [I]US2011235109 (YAMAGUCHI TAKESHI [JP]) [I] 1-3,5,7,11,13 * paragraphs [0160] - [0183]; figure 6 * |