Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
20.12.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.07.2017 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
30.06.2017 | Change - applicant | |
30.06.2017 | Change - applicant | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
30.06.2017 | Change - English title | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
08.02.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.02.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.04.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.03.2015 | Change - applicant | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
21.10.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
19.09.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
08.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant |