Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9330555 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2016 | B2 | US2014313041 | 23.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13164179 | 17.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014211435 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP13164179 | 17.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2793401 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13164179 | 17.04.2013 |