EP2617397 - Intraocular lens providing improved placement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optimedica Corporation 1310 Moffett Park Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | For all designated states Optimedica Corporation 1310 Moffett park Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Optimedica Corporation 1310 Moffett park Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Culbertson, William 3553 Royal Palm Avenue Miami, Florida 33133 / US | 02 /
Blumenkranz, Mark 20 Larguita Lane Portola Valley, California 94028 / US | 03 /
Angeley, David 2330 Walnut Ridge Lane Charlottesville, VA 22911 / US | 04 /
Marcellino, George 3773 Paul Sweet Road Santa Cruz, California 95065 / US | 05 /
Wiltberger, Michael 2553 Hayward Drive Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 06 /
Andersen, Dan 303 Oakwood Place Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Flaxman, Andrew James, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2016/50] |
Former [2013/35] | Flaxman, Andrew James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2013/30] | Gillard, Matthew Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13164190.4 | 13.03.2008 | [2013/30] | Priority number, date | US20070906944P | 13.03.2007 Original published format: US 906944 P | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617397 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2617397 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/10, A61F9/009, A61F9/007, A61F9/008, A61F2/16 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
A61F2/16 (EP,US);
A61F2/1613 (US);
A61F2/1637 (US);
A61F2/1648 (US);
A61F2/1662 (US);
A61F9/00 (EP,US);
A61F2002/1683 (US);
A61F2002/16901 (US);
A61F2009/00859 (EP,US);
A61F2009/0087 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00872 (EP,US);
A61F2009/0088 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00887 (US);
A61F2009/00897 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US);
A61F9/00754 (US);
A61F9/008 (US);
A61F9/00812 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | A61F9/00, A61F9/008, A61F2/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2013/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Intraokularlinse zur verbesserten Positionierung | [2013/30] | English: | Intraocular lens providing improved placement | [2013/30] | French: | Lentille intraoculaire pour placement amélioré | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 20.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08726825.6 / EP2129346 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080726825) is 08.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2008 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | IT | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | IE | 13.03.2017 | LU | 13.03.2017 | MT | 13.03.2017 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 13.03.2008 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
MT | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.03.2008 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
MT | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
MT | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0164135 (CUMMING J STUART [US]); | [X]US2003060880 (FEINGOLD VLADIMIR [US]); | [X]US2004148022 (EGGLESTON HARRY C [US]); | [X]US2005187623 (TASSIGNON MARIE-JOSE B [BE]); | [X]US2006235428 (SILVESTRINI THOMAS A [US]) | by applicant | US5459570 | US5748898 | US5748352 | US6053613 | US6111645 |