EP2617442 - Reduced-pressure treatment systems and methods employing hydrogel reservoir members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265 / US | [2017/31] |
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. 12930 IH-10 West San Antonio, TX 78249-2248 / US | ||
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US | ||
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. 12930 IH 10 West San Antonio TX 78249-2248 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robinson, Timothy Mark 27 Wellington Terrace Basingstoke, Hampshire RG23 8HH / GB | 02 /
Locke, Christopher Brian 6 Bosworth Mews Bournemouth, Dorset BH9 35D / GB | [2016/06] |
Former [2013/30] | 01 /
Robinson, Timothy, Mark 27 Wellington Terrace Basingstoke, Hampshire RG23 8HH / GB | ||
02 /
Locke, Christopher, Brian 6 Bosworth Mews Bournemouth, Dorset BH9 35D / GB | Representative(s) | Cordina, Kevin John Simmons & Simmons LLP CityPoint One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Cordina, Kevin John Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 13164197.9 | 25.05.2010 | [2013/30] | Priority number, date | US20090183285P | 02.06.2009 Original published format: US 183285 P | US20100786188 | 24.05.2010 Original published format: US 786188 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617442 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2617442 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
A61M1/90 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/00 (KR);
A61F13/02 (KR);
A61M1/65 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/912 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/915 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] |
Former [2013/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Behandlungssysteme mit reduziertem Druck und Verfahren mit Hydrogelreservoirelementen | [2013/30] | English: | Reduced-pressure treatment systems and methods employing hydrogel reservoir members | [2013/30] | French: | Systèmes de traitement à pression réduite et procédés employant des éléments de réservoir d'hydrogel | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 25.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10721243.3 / EP2437803 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE Paul Hartmann AG Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | 02
10.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE Smith & Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US Opponent's representative HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE Paul Hartmann AG Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | ||
02
10.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE Smith & Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US Opponent's representative HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | |||
Former [2016/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.11.2016
Paul Hartmann AG Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | 19.12.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.05.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.05.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.05.2018 | 17.05.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 01.06.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2010 | AL | 10.02.2016 | AT | 10.02.2016 | BE | 10.02.2016 | CY | 10.02.2016 | CZ | 10.02.2016 | DK | 10.02.2016 | EE | 10.02.2016 | ES | 10.02.2016 | FI | 10.02.2016 | HR | 10.02.2016 | IT | 10.02.2016 | LT | 10.02.2016 | LV | 10.02.2016 | MC | 10.02.2016 | MK | 10.02.2016 | NL | 10.02.2016 | PL | 10.02.2016 | RO | 10.02.2016 | SE | 10.02.2016 | SI | 10.02.2016 | SK | 10.02.2016 | SM | 10.02.2016 | TR | 10.02.2016 | BG | 10.05.2016 | NO | 10.05.2016 | GR | 11.05.2016 | IE | 25.05.2016 | LU | 25.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | FR | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | IS | 10.06.2016 | PT | 13.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 25.05.2010 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
TR | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 25.05.2016 | ||
LU | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 25.05.2010 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
TR | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 25.05.2016 | ||
LU | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.05.2010 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 25.05.2016 | ||
LU | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 25.05.2016 | ||
LU | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LU | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LU | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LU | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005123170 (ETHICON INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,12 * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 29 * * page 12, line 31 - page 15, line 21 * * page 17, line 19 - page 17, line 25 ** page 19, line 17 - page 21, line 19; figures 1-7 *; | [XYI]US2007185426 (AMBROSIO ARCHEL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 5 [I] 4; | [Y]WO2008086397 (UNIV WAKE FOREST HEALTH SCIENCES [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1,2a,2b * | Examination | US2008033324 | Opposition | US4676784 | US5115801 | EP0541391 | US6905986 | WO2005123170 | GB2415908 | WO2007106591 | US2007265586 | US2008082059 | US2008215020 | US2008234641 | WO2009002260 | US2009012441 | EP0041934 | EP0455324 | EP0543868 | US2005186260 | WO2006005939 | WO2006014917 | US2007185426 | EP1994916 | WO2010000450 | WO2010142959 | - FL BUCHHOLZ et al., Modern Superabsorbent Polymer Technology, (19980000), ISBN 0-471-19411-5, XP055259884 | - "Combining Ionic Silver Wound Hydrogel and Negative Pressure for Limb Salvage Study #LIT465", The Symposium of Advanced Wound Care, (20060400), XP055322726 | - FL BUCHHOLZ et al., Modern Superabsorbent Polymer Technology, (19980000), pages 5 - 11 , 182-195, XP055259884 | - HUA et al., "Synthesis of self-crosslinking sodium polyacrylate hydrogel and water-absorbing mechanism", J. Mat. Sci.;, (20010000), vol. 36, pages 731 - 738, XP055322733 |