EP2792337 - Fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSN medical GmbH Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | [2017/06] |
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states BSN Medical GmbH Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grunden, Jennifer Eimsbütteler Str. 100b 22769 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Schmeltzpfenning, Timo Lohbergenweg 28b 21244 Buchholz / DE | 03 /
Bauer, Joachim Hahnenfussweg 2a 22589 Hamburg / DE | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2018/11] |
Former [2014/43] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13164211.8 | 17.04.2013 | [2014/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2792337 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2792337 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01, A61F5/37, A44B11/25, A44B11/28 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
A44B11/2584 (EP,US);
A44B11/28 (US);
A61F5/01 (EP,US);
A61F5/373 (EP,US);
A61F5/3738 (EP,US);
A44B13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2014/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verschluss | [2014/43] | English: | Fastener | [2014/43] | French: | Attache | [2014/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2013 | AL | 14.03.2018 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | ES | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | IT | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | MK | 14.03.2018 | MT | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | RS | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | SM | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | AT | 17.04.2018 | IE | 17.04.2018 | LU | 17.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | NO | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.04.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 17.04.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 17.04.2013 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 17.04.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 17.04.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 17.04.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1188709 (WENZEL WALLACE [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,14 * page 2, lines 47-84; figure 4 * [I] 4,5,13; | [A]US2003176823 (MASON JEFFREY T [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XI]US2005187504 (MODGLIN MICHAEL D [US]) [X] 1-4,14 * paragraphs [0066] - [0068]; figure 15 * [I] 5-7,13; | [XI]DE112011100230T (THUASNE [FR]) [X] 1-3,14,15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0023]; figures 2-6 * [I] 4-7,13 | Examination | US868298 | by applicant | DE19745705 |