Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | MT | | NL | | PL | | PT | | RO | | SE | | SI | | SK | | TR | | Examination procedure | 13.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | European patent granted | 22.08.2018 | Opposition procedure | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2019 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 13.11.2013 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 2097105 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 13.11.2013 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 12.03.2014 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 39/395 20060101AFI20140205BHEP | | Event date: | 12.03.2014 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C07K 16/28 20060101ALI20140205BHEP | | Event date: | 12.03.2014 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 22.10.2014 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20140912 | | Event date: | 22.10.2014 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 02.09.2015 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20150731 | | Event date: | 11.04.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MCEVER, RODGER P. | | Event date: | 11.04.2018 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20180315 | | Event date: | 11.04.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | KAWAR, ZIAD | | Event date: | 11.04.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | ALVAREZ, RICHARD | | Event date: | 22.08.2018 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 2097105 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 22.08.2018 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 22.08.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 31.08.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 15.09.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 1031691 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20180915 | | Event date: | 20.09.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602007055908 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Event date: | 19.09.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 26.10.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 19.12.2018 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | NOVARTIS AG | | Event date: | 12.12.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL FP | Code Expl.: | TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY) | | Event date: | 17.12.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20181210 | | Event date: | 26.12.2018 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | NOVARTIS AG | | Event date: | 26.12.2018 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | OKLAHOMA MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION | | Event date: | 27.12.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 19.12.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | OKLAHOMA MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION; US | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: SELEXYS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION | Effective DATE: | 20181122 | | Event date: | 15.01.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG4A E016390 EE | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA | Effective DATE: | 20181121 | | Event date: | 08.02.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2699273 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20190208 | | Event date: | 02.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK T3 E 29327 SK | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK | | Event date: | 15.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT PC 1031691 AT T | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE OWNER | OWNER: | OKLAHOMA MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, US | Effective DATE: | 20190220 | | Event date: | 15.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT PC 1031691 AT T | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE OWNER | OWNER: | NOVARTIS AG, CH | Effective DATE: | 20190220 | | Event date: | 24.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20180403557 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20190422 | | Event date: | 28.06.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E041957 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 23.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602007055908 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Event date: | 31.07.2019 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20190523 | | Event date: | 03.12.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A 2662091 PT 20181203 T | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20181122 | | Event date: | 15.11.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT UEP 1031691 AT T | Code Expl.: | +PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION | Effective DATE: | 20180822 | | Event date: | 07.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL SPCF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 301098 | Filing DATE: | 20210401 | Expiry DATE: | 20271129 | Extension DATE: | 20321129 | | Event date: | 04.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2190010-5 | | Event date: | 10.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT SPCF | Code Expl.: | FILING AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: KRIZANLIZUMABAS; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201028 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | PA2021506 | Filing DATE: | 20210413 | Expiry DATE: | 20271130 | | Event date: | 03.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK CTFF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CERTIFIKAT; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | CA 2021 00009 | Filing DATE: | 20210413 | Expiry DATE: | 20271130 | Extension DATE: | 20321130 | | Event date: | 12.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/20/1476 20201029; UK FURTHER MAS ON IPSUM 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB21/023 | Filing DATE: | 20210414 | | Event date: | 14.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI SPCF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE APPLICATION FILED | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C20210008 | | Event date: | 15.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT SPCF 1031691 AT T | Code Expl.: | +FILING AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 (MITTEILUNG) 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 11/2021 | Filing DATE: | 20210414 | Effective DATE: | 20210515 | | Event date: | 17.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE AA1Y E016390 EE | Code Expl.: | +SPC FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: KRISANLIZUMAB;REG NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 29.10.2020 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C20210007 | Filing DATE: | 20210408 | | Event date: | 13.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602007055908 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | OKLAHOMA MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, OKLAHOMA, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: SELEXYS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION, OKLAHOMA CITY, OKLA., US | | Event date: | 13.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602007055908 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | NOVARTIS AG, CH | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: SELEXYS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION, OKLAHOMA CITY, OKLA., US | | Event date: | 04.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LU SPCF | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; AUTHORISATION NUMBER AND DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | LUC00201 | Filing DATE: | 20210408 | Expiry DATE: | 20271130 | Extension DATE: | 20321130 | | Event date: | 26.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK SPCF | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: KRIZANLIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 50006-2021 | Filing DATE: | 20210413 | | Event date: | 28.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AA1S E041957 | Code Expl.: | +INFORMATION ON APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | S2100011 | Filing DATE: | 20210407 | | Event date: | 28.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AA1S E041957 | Code Expl.: | +INFORMATION ON APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | S2100015 | Filing DATE: | 20210423 | | Event date: | 02.06.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20210506 AND 20210512 | | Event date: | 15.06.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT SPCG 1031691 AT T | Code Expl.: | +GRANT OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 (MITTEILUNG) 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 11/2021 | Filing DATE: | 20210414 | Expiry DATE: | 20271130 | Extension DATE: | 20321130 | Effective DATE: | 20210615 | | Event date: | 13.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CP | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 21C1015 | Filing DATE: | 20210413 | | Event date: | 31.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | OKLAHOMA MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION; US | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: SELEXYS PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION | Effective DATE: | 20210409 | | Event date: | 31.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE SPCF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; AUTHORISATION NUMBER AND DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2021C/511 | Filing DATE: | 20210412 | Expiry DATE: | 20271130 | Extension DATE: | 20321130 | | Event date: | 21.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R065 602007055908 DE | Code Expl.: | +REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE VALIDLY FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201028 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 122021000019 | Filing DATE: | 20210414 | Expiry DATE: | 20271201 | | Event date: | 12.05.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE SPCF | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: ADAKVEO (CRIZANLIZUMAB); NAT REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029; FIRST REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 29/10/2020 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2021/012 | Filing DATE: | 20210413 | | Event date: | 19.07.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES SPCF | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; NATIONAL AUTHORISATION NUMBER: EU/1/20/1476; DATE OF AUTHORISATION: 20201028; NUMBER OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EUROPEAN ECONOMIC AREA (EEA): EU/1/20/1476; DATE OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EEA: 20201028 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C202130016 | Effective DATE: | 20210409 | | Event date: | 20.07.2018 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 17.07.2018 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 14.03.2018 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 07.02.2014 | | Event description: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Event date: | 12.11.2013 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 28.06.2019 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 16.08.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG1Y E016390 EE | Code Expl.: | +SPC GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: KRISANLIZUMAB;REG NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 29.10.2020 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C20210007 00321 | Filing DATE: | 20210408 | Extension DATE: | 20321130 | | Event date: | 26.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IT SPCG 502018000035783 IT | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB(ADAKVEO); AUTHORISATION NUMBER(S) AND DATE(S): EU/1/20/1476, 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 132021000000041 | Extension DATE: | 20321130 | | Event date: | 13.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IT SPCF 502018000035783 IT | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB(ADAKVEO); AUTHORISATION NUMBER(S) AND DATE(S): EU/1/20/1476, 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 132021000000041 | | Event date: | 15.12.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE SPCT | Code Expl.: | PARTY DATA CHANGE RELATED TO A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | TZ1Y, PARTY DATA CHANGE RELATED TO A GRANTED SPC | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 00321 | | Event date: | 28.01.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU FG4S E041957 | Code Expl.: | +GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | S2100015 | Filing DATE: | 20210423 | | Event date: | 23.02.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; NATIONAL AUTHORISATION NUMBER: EU/1/20/1476; DATE OF AUTHORISATION: 20201028; NUMBER OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EUROPEAN ECONOMIC AREA (EEA): EU/1/20/1476; DATE OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EEA: 20201028 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C202130016 | Extension DATE: | 20321130 | Effective DATE: | 20220217 | | Event date: | 28.06.2019 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 22.04.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CT | Code Expl.: | +GRANTED SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FOR MEDICINE (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992) | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 21C1015 | Filing DATE: | 20210413 | Extension DATE: | 20321129 | | Event date: | 03.05.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LU SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; AUTHORISATION NUMBER AND DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | LUC00201 | Filing DATE: | 20210408 | Expiry DATE: | 20271130 | Extension DATE: | 20321130 | Effective DATE: | 20220429 | | Event date: | 21.06.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2190010-5 | Expiry DATE: | 20271201 | Extension DATE: | 20321130 | | Event date: | 10.10.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT SPCG | Code Expl.: | +GRANT OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: KRIZANLIZUMABAS; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201028 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | PA2021506,C2662091 | Filing DATE: | 20210413 | Expiry DATE: | 20271130 | Extension DATE: | 20321130 | | Event date: | 13.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CP | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 21C1015 | Filing DATE: | 20210413 | Extension DATE: | 20321129 | | Event date: | 05.07.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230526 | | Event date: | 12.07.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) CHANGED | Effective DATE: | 20230530 | | Event date: | 03.01.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFG | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/20/1476 (NI) 20201029; UK PLGB 00101/1191 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB21/023 | Filing DATE: | 20210414 | Extension DATE: | 20321129 | Effective DATE: | 20231112 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20231023 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 08.07.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK CTFG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) ISSUED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CRIZANLIZUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/20/1476 20201029 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | CR 2021 00009 | Filing DATE: | 20210413 | Expiry DATE: | 20271130 | Extension DATE: | 20321130 | | Event date: | 15.11.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20241024 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 12.12.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20241127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 16.12.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20241113 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 08.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20241112 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 09.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Payment DATE: | 20241024 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 10.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20241023 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 14.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20241029 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 15.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20241118 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 16.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20241029 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 16.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Payment DATE: | 20241023 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 16.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 16.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20241027 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 17.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20241017 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 20.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20241029 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 21.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20241021 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 21.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Payment DATE: | 20241021 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 23.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20241025 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 23.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20241021 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 23.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Payment DATE: | 20241023 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 24.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20241119 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 24.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20241023 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 27.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20241023 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 27.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Payment DATE: | 20241113 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 28.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20241209 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 28.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20241028 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 29.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20241028 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 31.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20241201 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 31.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MT | Payment DATE: | 20241119 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 03.02.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20241125 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 25.02.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Payment DATE: | 20241025 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | |