EP2796135 - Use of trifluoroacetic acid and salts thereof to treat hypercholesterolemia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLICHEM S.A. 50 Val Fleuri 1526 Luxembourg / LU | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bulgheroni, Anna Via G. Zanella, 20 21100 VARESE / IT | 02 /
Legora, Michela Via Castellazzo 1 B 22070 Appiano Gentile (CO) / IT | 03 /
Ceriani, Daniela Via Vignora, 9/D 21050 BESANO (VA) / IT | 04 /
Mailland, Federico Strada Regina, 10 6900 LUGANO / CH | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 13164730.7 | 22.04.2013 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2796135 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/19, A61P3/00, A61P9/00, A61P9/10 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/19 (EP);
A61K9/0007 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K9/0095 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP);
A61K9/2027 (EP);
A61K9/2846 (EP);
A61K9/4866 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung von Trifluoressigsäure und Salzen davon zur Behandlung von Hypercholesterinämie | [2014/44] | English: | Use of trifluoroacetic acid and salts thereof to treat hypercholesterolemia | [2014/44] | French: | Utilisation d'acide trifluoroacétique et de ses sels pour traiter l'hypercholestérolémie | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2013 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 30.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/48] | 12.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]WO2006000339 (PHARMAPRODUCTS UK LTD [GB], et al); | by applicant | WO03006031 | WO2006000020 |