EP2796946 - Timepiece including a digital device for displaying information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETA SA Manufacture Horlogère Suisse Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubois, Fabian Rue Henri-Perret 9 2400 Le Locle / CH | 02 /
Laconte, Jean Gare 4 2013 Colombier / CH | 03 /
Jufer, Martin Blenggen 4917 Melchnau / CH | 04 /
Leoni, Stéphane Rue de la Tannerie 13 2608 Courtelary / CH | 05 /
Schlappach, Marc Wuhrmatt Strasse 8 4800 Zosingen / CH | 06 /
Vidovic, Mile Oberbottigenweg 43A 3019 Bern / CH | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Supper, Marc, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Supper, Marc, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets Fbg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 13165115.0 | 24.04.2013 | [2014/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2796946 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G04G17/04 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
G04G17/045 (EP,US);
G04C10/02 (US);
G04G9/0035 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2014/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Uhr mit einer digitalen Informationsanzeigevorrichtung | [2014/44] | English: | Timepiece including a digital device for displaying information | [2014/44] | French: | Pièce d'horlogerie comprenant un dispositif numérique d'affichage d'informations | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4218872 (IKEGAMI TOSHIMASA [JP]) [X] 1,2,20-22 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 51; figure 1 * * column 4, lines 29-44; figure 2 * * column 4, lines 45-59; figure 3 * * column 5, lines 23-34 * [Y] 6-13 [I] 3-5; | [XI]DE19857997 (CREATIV PRODUCT ELEKTRO UND FE [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * column 1, lines 11-57; figure 4 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 8; figure 1 * * claim 1 * [I] 3-6,16-22; | [XYI]US4257115 (HATUSE TOSHIKAZU, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, lines 49-55; figure 4 * [Y] 6-13 [I] 3-5,20-22; | [A]US2003026171 (BREWER DONALD R [US], et al) [A] 4,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH1082871 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [Y] 6,7 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] *; | [Y]JPH1082872 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [Y] 6,7 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2011106908 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [Y] 8-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH09274085 (KAWAGUCHIKO SEIMITSU KK) [Y] 8-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH0990059 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [Y] 8-13 * abstract * * figures 1-6 *; | [Y]JP2004012405 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [Y] 8-13 * the whole document *; | [A]CH626496 (EBAUCHES ELECTRONIQUES SA [CH]) [A] 1 * abregé; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US4044542 (BURKE ROGER A) [A] 1 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 2; figures 1,2,4,5 * |