EP2657831 - Method and terminal for displaying a plurality of pages, method and terminal for displaying a plurality of applications being executed on terminal, and method of executing a plurality of applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sun, Kwang-won B-102 Dongil Villa 377-2 Pajang-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Kang-tae 505-304 Manhyeong Maeul Hyundai I-Park 5-danji Apt. Sanghyeon 2-dong Suji-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Doo-hwan No 401 Haneulchae 530-6 Gokbanjeong-dong Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Eun-young 604-603 Gangnam Maeul Summitville Apt. Gugal-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Kim, Chul-joo 705-504 Salgugol 7-danji Apt Yeongtong 2-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Kim, Duck-hyun No 1314 Gioberg Officetel 1013 Gwonseon-dong Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Han, Jong-won 108-403 Lucky Apt. Hogye 2-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Gover, Richard Paul Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13165446.9 | 25.04.2013 | [2013/44] | Priority number, date | KR20120043893 | 26.04.2012 Original published format: KR 20120043893 | KR20120094446 | 28.08.2012 Original published format: KR 20120094446 | KR20120157206 | 28.12.2012 Original published format: KR 20120157206 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2657831 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2657831 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/0482, G06F3/0483 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/04845 (US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/0483 (EP,US);
G06F3/0486 (US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Endgerät zum Anzeigen von mehreren Seiten, Verfahren und Endgerät zum Anzeigen mehrerer Anwendungen, die auf dem Endgerät ausgeführt werden, und Verfahren zur Ausführung mehrerer Anwendungen | [2013/44] | English: | Method and terminal for displaying a plurality of pages, method and terminal for displaying a plurality of applications being executed on terminal, and method of executing a plurality of applications | [2013/44] | French: | Procédé et terminal pour afficher une pluralité de pages, procédé et terminal pour afficher une pluralité d'applications exécutées sur un terminal et procédé d'exécution d'une pluralité d'applications | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 19.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 10.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.06.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001024195 (HAYAKAWA KEISUKE [JP]) [X] 1-7,14,15 * paragraph [0220] - paragraph [0260]; figures 25-30,44-47 *; | [X]US2006190833 (SANGIOVANNI JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,14,15 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0075]; figures 10-14 *; | [X]US2011078624 (MISSIG JULIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0180]; figures 5-6 *; | [X]EP2437152 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,5-9,14,15* paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0130]; figures 2-5 *; | [XI]US2012096396 (ORDING BAS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,10,12,14,15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0050]; figure 2B * [I] 3,4,6,7,9 |