EP2799264 - Utility vehicle for the transport of temperature-managed goods and method for operating a refrigerating machine intended for use in such a commercial vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmitz Cargobull AG Siemensstraße 50 48341 Altenberge / DE | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flacke, Norbert Ernst-Max-Gey-Strasse 8 45894 Gelsenkirchen / DE | 02 /
Schanzmann, Martin Grüner Weg 34 46395 Bocholt / DE | [2015/03] |
Former [2014/45] | 01 /
Flacke, Norbert Ernst-Max-Gey-Strasse 8 45894 Gelsenkirchen / DE | ||
02 /
Schanzmann, Martin Grüner Weg 8 46395 Bocholt / DE | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13165755.3 | 29.04.2013 | [2014/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2799264 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60H1/32, B60P3/20, F24F11/02, F25D29/00, B65D88/74, G05D23/19 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
B60H1/00014 (EP,US);
B60H1/00764 (EP);
B60H1/3232 (EP,US);
B60P3/20 (EP);
F25D29/003 (EP);
G05D23/1905 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2014/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nutzfahrzeug für den Transport von temperaturgeführtem Transportgut und Verfahren zum Betrieb einer bei einem solchen Nutzfahrzeug vorgesehenen Kältemaschine | [2014/45] | English: | Utility vehicle for the transport of temperature-managed goods and method for operating a refrigerating machine intended for use in such a commercial vehicle | [2014/45] | French: | Véhicule utilitaire pour le transport de marchandises de transport à température contrôlée et procédé de fonctionnement d'une machine frigorifique prévue pour un tel véhicule utilitaire | [2014/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 23.02.2016 | Observations by third parties | 18.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2017 | Observations by third parties | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 20.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2393055 (THERMO KING CORP [US]) [X] 1-8,10,12-14 * paragraphs [0017] - [0026]; figures 1-3 * [I] 9,11; | [A]EP2479515 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0016] - [0025]; figures 1,7 *; | [A]EP1939036 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0035] - [0039]; figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]EP1512565 (TOSHIBA CARRIER CORP [JP]) [A] 9,11 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0022] - [0024]; figures 1,2,4 * | by applicant | DE10018942 | DE19946802 | EP2116461 | DE102010022993 | other | EP1393055 | EP2479515 | EP1512565 |