EP2682060 - Method and apparatus for displaying three-dimensional ultrasonic image and two-dimensional ultrasonic image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Medison Co., Ltd. 3366, Hanseo-ro Nam-myeon Hongcheon-gun Gangwon-do 250-870 / KR | [2014/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Sung-wook 3366, Hanseo-ro Nam-myeon Hongcheon-gun, Gangwon-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Jin-yong 3366, Hanseo-ro Nam-myeon Hongcheon-gun, Gangwon-do / KR | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Markus Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Straße 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Lorenz, Markus Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Straße 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 13166730.5 | 07.05.2013 | [2014/02] | Priority number, date | KR20120062349 | 11.06.2012 Original published format: KR 20120062349 | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2682060 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
A61B8/463 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
A61B8/13 (US);
A61B8/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61B8/466 (EP,US);
A61B8/469 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Anzeigen dreidimensionaler und zweidimensionaler Ultraschallbilder | [2014/02] | English: | Method and apparatus for displaying three-dimensional ultrasonic image and two-dimensional ultrasonic image | [2014/02] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour afficher une image ultrasonore tridimensionnelle et une image ultrasonore bidimensionnelle | [2014/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 05.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005096538 (CHOMAS JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,12,15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0019] - [0033] - [0036] - [0061]; figures 1,2,4a-4b; claim 6 * [I] 3,5-8,11,13,14; | [A]US2006084872 (ICHIKAWA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 8* paragraphs [0023] , [0025] , [0029] - [0040] - [0057]; figures 4,5,10-12 *; | [A]US2008077013 (KAWAGISHI TETSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 2,6,10,14 * paragraphs [0159] - [0167] - [0228] , [0229]; figures 4,14 *; | [A]US2011054319 (LEE YUN HEE [KR]) [A] 2,6,7,10,14 * paragraphs [0008] , [0025] , [0029] - [0036]; figure 5 *; | [X]US2011245670 (TASHIRO RIKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,9,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0045] - [0047] - [0055] , [0065]; figures 4-6,7a-7c,12,13 *; | [A]US2011313291 (CHONO TOMOAKI [JP]) [A] 1,9,15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0046] , [0060] , [0069]; figure 2 * |