EP2669784 - Mobile terminal and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Jongseok c/o LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 327-23, Kasan-dong, Kumchon-gu 153-801 Seoul / KR | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13166795.8 | 07.05.2013 | [2013/49] | Priority number, date | KR20120056724 | 29.05.2012 Original published format: KR 20120056724 | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2669784 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (KR);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
G06F2203/04804 (EP,US);
H04M1/72403 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2013/49] | English: | Mobile terminal and control method thereof | [2013/49] | French: | Terminal mobile et son procédé de contrôle | [2013/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 01.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 06.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2375316 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0100] - [0107] * * paragraphs [0149] - [0166] * * claims 1-9 *; | [X]US2008163082 (RYTIVAARA MARKKU [FI]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0026] *; | [A]US2011252357 (CHAUDHRI IMRAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0234] - [0249] - [0307] * |