EP2713177 - Medical imaging apparatus and control method thereof with classification and recommendation of protocols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.09.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Petition for review: decision | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oh, Keum Yong 312-2002, Dongwon Royal Deukl Bojeong-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Hei Soog 13-1401, Samho Newtown Apt. Bisan 3-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Kyoung Kyu 403, Chowonvill 365-1, Sin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Min Ha 13-513, Sambo Apt. Gyesan 3-dong Gyeyang-gu Incheon / KR | 05 /
A Kang, Jeong 945-404, Byeokjeokgol Lotte Apt. Yeontong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/36] |
Former [2014/14] | 01 /
Oh, Keum Yong 312-2002, Dongwon Royal Deukl Bojeong-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Hei Soog 13-1401, Samho Newtown Apt. Bisan 3-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Lee, Kyoung Kyu 403, Chowonvill 365-1, Sin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Lee, Min Ha 13-513, Sambo Apt. Gyesan 3-dong Gyeyang-gu Incheon / KR | |||
05 /
Kang, Jeong A 945-404, Byeokjeokgol Lotte Apt. Yeontong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2015/36] |
Former [2014/14] | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 13166842.8 | 07.05.2013 | [2014/14] | Priority number, date | KR20120107036 | 26.09.2012 Original published format: KR 20120107036 | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2713177 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2713177 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/54, A61B5/055 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (CN,KR,US);
G01R33/543 (EP,US);
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
G01R33/546 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/14] | G01R33/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Title | German: | Medizinisches Bildgebungsgerät und Steuerverfahren dafür mit Klassifikation und Empfehlung von Protokollen | [2014/14] | English: | Medical imaging apparatus and control method thereof with classification and recommendation of protocols | [2014/14] | French: | Appareil d'imagerie médicale et son procédé de commande avec classification et recommandation de protocoles | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 10.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2016
08.06.2016
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2016/28] | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 08.07.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.11.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.01.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 29.06.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/43] | 22.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 07.03.2018 | Appeal received No. T0634/18 | 29.06.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 22.09.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 29.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Petition(s) for review: | 02.12.2022 | Petition for review received | Number: R0024/22 | for appeal No. T0634/18-3401 | Petitioner: APPR | 30.11.2023 | Decision: Petition for review obviously unsubstantiated only. | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2013 | AL | 02.09.2015 | AT | 02.09.2015 | BE | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | DK | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | ES | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | HR | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | MK | 02.09.2015 | NL | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | RS | 02.09.2015 | SE | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | SM | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | NO | 02.12.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | IE | 07.05.2016 | LU | 07.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | GB | 07.05.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 07.05.2016 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 07.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 07.05.2016 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 07.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 07.05.2016 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 07.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 07.05.2016 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 07.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 07.05.2016 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 07.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 07.05.2016 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 07.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 02.09.2015 | |
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004147840 (DUGGIRALA BHAVANI [US], et al) [X] 1,3-15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0049]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072]; figure 4 *; | [X]US2008172249 (GLASER-SEIDNITZER KARLHEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1, 3; claims 1-19 *; | [X]US2010049050 (PELISSIER LAURENT [CA], et al) [X] 1,3-15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1, 1A * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0123]; claims 1-13, 21 *; | [XI]WO2012117314 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12,15 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 30 * * page 13, line 21 - line 30 * [I] 6,7,13,14; | [X] - J. BIEDERER ET AL, "MRI of the lung (2/3). Why ... when ... how?", INSIGHTS INTO IMAGING, (20120213), vol. 3, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s13244-011-0146-8, pages 355 - 371, XP055071180 [X] 1-15 * page 3; tables 1, 3 * * page 12, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13244-011-0146-8 | [L] - J BIEDERER ET AL, "MRI of the Lung - ready ... get set ... go!", MAGNETOM FLASH, (20110101), pages 6 - 15, XP055071186 [L] 1-15 * page 8 - page 13; figures 2, 3, 5, 7, 8, 10; table 1 * * This document completes the disclosure of the method/apparatus of document XP055071180, which explicitly makes reference to XP055071186. * | Examination | US2004193036 | - T. Alsinet ET AL, "Automated monitoring of medical protocols: a secure and distributed architecture", Artificial Intelligence in Medicine, (20030301), vol. 27, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0933-3657(03)00010-1, ISSN 0933-3657, pages 367 - 392, XP055071179 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0933-3657(03)00010-1 | - REHWALD WOLFGANG G ET AL, "Cardiovascular MRI: its current and future use in clinical practice", EXPERT REVIEW OF CARDIOVASCULAR THERAPY, EXPERT REVIEWS LTD, GB, (20070301), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1744-8344, pages 307 - 321, XP009171167 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/14779072.5.2.307 | Opposition | EP1229472 | US2003095150 | EP1354554 | US2005053190 | US2005121505 | US2008108895 | US2008119717 | US2008172249 | US2009006131 | US2011110572 | WO2012080904 | WO2012104780 | - MCROBBIE DONALD W. et al., "What you set is what you get: basic image optimization", MRI From Picture to Proton, Cambridge, Cambridge Press, (20060000), XP055300945 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/CBO9780511545405.005 | - SIEMENS AG, "Syngo MR D11 Operator Manual", Scanning and postprocessing, (20100000), pages C-1 - C-3; p. C.2-1 - C.2-2, XP055300960 | - SIEMENS AG, Syngo MR D11 Operator Manual - Neuro, (20100000), pages B-1 - B-4; p. B.2-1 - B.2-8, XP055300963 | - Qiong Song et al., "Non-Contrast-Enhanced Magnetic Resonance Angiography Using T2-Weighted 3- Dimensional Fat-Suppressed Turbo Spin Echo (SPACE): Diagnostic Performance and Comparison With Contrast-Enhanced Magnetic Resonance Angiography Using Volume Interpolated Breath-Hold Examination in the Detection of Portosystemi", J. Comput. Assist Tomography, (20120508), vol. 36, no. 6, pages 675 - 680, XP055300965 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/RCT.0b013e31826999df | - "MAGNETOM Flash", The Magazine of MR, (20110100), XP055300932 | - "Wayback machine", MAGNETOM Flash, (20110828), URL: https://web.archive.org, (20160601), XP055300971 |