EP2801498 - Assembly and method for inductively charging mobile devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brusa Elektronik AG Neudorf 14 9466 Sennwald / CH | [2014/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krause, Axel Bühl 9650 Nesslau / CH | 02 /
Matt, Phillipp Bahnhofstr. 32 6820 Frastanz / AT | [2014/46] | Representative(s) | PPR AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | Application number, filing date | 13166872.5 | 07.05.2013 | [2014/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2801498 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
H01F27/38 (EP,US);
B60L53/124 (EP,US);
B60L53/126 (EP,US);
B60L53/38 (EP);
H01F38/14 (EP);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J50/402 (EP,US);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2014/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zum induktiven Laden von mobilen Geräten | [2014/46] | English: | Assembly and method for inductively charging mobile devices | [2014/46] | French: | Agencement et procédé pour la charge inductive d'appareils mobiles | [2014/46] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007013725 (LS CABLE LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 2 * figure 2 * * abstract *; | [AD]WO2007019806 (UNIV CITY HONG KONG [CN], et al) [AD] 1-15; | [X]WO2008051611 (FARKAS LASZIO [US]) [X] 1,11 * page 5 - page 6 * * figures 1,2 * * abstract *; | [Y]DE202009009693U (CONDUCTIX WAMPFLER AG [DE]) [Y] 2,3,7,8 * page 3, paragraphs 13-19 * * figure 2 * * abstract *; | [AD]EP2267864 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD [JP])[AD] 1-15; | [XY]EP2524834 (BRUSA ELEKTRONIK AG [CH]) [X] 1,4-7,9-15 * column 10, paragraph 47 - column 12, paragraph 51 * * figures 2a-2c * * abstract * [Y] 2,3,7,8 | by applicant | WO0203764 | WO2007019806 | EP2267864 |