EP2682161 - Liquid cleaning and care agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fitzner, Sabine Kornblumenweg 9 51147 Köln / DE | [2016/06] |
Former [2014/02] | For all designated states Kreuzkamp, Markus Im Heidewinkel 25 40625 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/06] |
Former [2014/02] | 01 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Fritz, Edmund Lothar Fritz & Brandenburg Patentanwälte Malteserstraße 10a 50859 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Fritz, Edmund Lothar Fritz & Brandenburg Patentanwälte Stolbergerstraße 368 50933 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 13166977.2 | 08.05.2013 | [2014/02] | Priority number, date | DE201210104281 | 16.05.2012 Original published format: DE102012104281 | [2014/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2682161 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2682161 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2682161 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/12, A61Q5/02, A61Q19/10, A61K8/44 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
A61K8/442 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Title | German: | Flüssiges Reinigungs- und Pflegemittel | [2014/02] | English: | Liquid cleaning and care agent | [2014/02] | French: | Agent de nettoyage et d'entretien liquide | [2014/02] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 24.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2013 | AL | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | DK | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | ES | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | HR | 06.07.2016 | IT | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | MK | 06.07.2016 | MT | 06.07.2016 | NL | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | RS | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | SM | 06.07.2016 | TR | 06.07.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | NO | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 08.05.2013 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 08.05.2013 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.05.2013 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 06.07.2016 | |
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 06.07.2016 | |
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 06.07.2016 | |
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010069500 (KPSS KAO GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,10,11,13-15 * page 28; example 4 *; | [ID]DE19723763 (GOLDWELL GMBH [DE]) [ID] 1-15 * page 1, line 26 - line 29 * | by applicant | DE102006059465 | DE19723763 | US5866110 |