Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102038723B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2019 | B1 | KR20150013482 | 05.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213470238 | 11.05.2012 | WO2013CA00461 | 10.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104285491B | Global Dossier | 06.01.2016 | B | CN104285491 | 14.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213470238 | 11.05.2012 | WO2013CA00461 | 10.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013166591 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213470238 | 11.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8989113 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2015 | B2 | US2013301541 | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213470238 | 11.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2670206 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2016 | B1 | EP2670206 | 04.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213470238 | 11.05.2012 |