EP2682713 - Sensor system and method for operating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Dr. Johannes-Heidenhain-Strasse 5 83301 Traunreut / DE | [2014/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gröll, Klaus Bahnhofstr. 5 83329 Waging am See / DE | 02 /
Eisenberger, Christian Brandstätterstr. 35 83324 Ruhpolding / DE | [2014/02] | Application number, filing date | 13167841.9 | 15.05.2013 | [2014/02] | Priority number, date | DE201210211612 | 04.07.2012 Original published format: DE102012211612 | [2014/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2682713 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2682713 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/04, G01B5/012 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
H04B7/02 (EP);
G01B5/012 (EP,US);
G01B21/047 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (US);
G01B2210/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] |
Former [2014/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Tastsystem und Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Tastsystems | [2014/02] | English: | Sensor system and method for operating same | [2014/02] | French: | Système de palpage et procédé destiné au fonctionnement d'un système de palpage | [2020/15] |
Former [2014/02] | Système de palpage et procédé destiné au fonctionnement dýun système de palpage | Examination procedure | 03.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 26.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2013 | AL | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | AT | 15.05.2020 | IE | 15.05.2020 | LU | 15.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | FR | 08.06.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.05.2013 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.05.2020 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.05.2020 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.05.2020 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2558557 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]EP0509677 (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC [GB]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [YD]EP2317278 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [YD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y] - NETHI S ET AL, "Time and antenna diversity in wireless sensor and actuator networks", COMMUNICATIONS (MICC), 2009 IEEE 9TH MALAYSIA INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091215), ISBN 978-1-4244-5531-7, pages 932 - 937, XP031648566 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2317278 |