blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2671972

EP2671972 - Use of a solution containing phosphonic acid and/or phosphonic acid derivatives during the degreasing of metal surfaces, degreasing solution and method for degreasing a metal surface [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2022
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.04.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.12.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 09.10.2024  [2024/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stockmeier Chemie GmbH & Co. KG
Eckendorfer Strasse 10
33609 Bielefeld / DE
[2013/50]
Inventor(s)01 / ROTHFELD, Sascha
Am Dortenbach 58
33397 Rietberg / DE
02 / NEUHAUS, Gunter
Speckfeld 35
33824 Werther / DE
03 / KADER, Jürgen
Goethestr. 17
51789 Lindlar / DE
 [2021/18]
Former [2013/50]01 / ROTHFELD, Sascha
Am Dortenbach 58
33397 Rietberg / DE
Representative(s)Dantz, Jan Henning, et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2021/18]
Former [2013/50]Dantz, Jan Henning, et al
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13168021.716.05.2013
[2013/50]
Priority number, dateDE20121010495108.06.2012         Original published format: DE102012104951
[2013/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2671972
Date:11.12.2013
Language:DE
[2013/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2671972
Date:05.05.2021
Language:DE
[2021/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2013
ClassificationIPC:C23G1/06, C23G1/08, C11D1/34, C11D11/00
[2013/50]
CPC:
C23G1/088 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/18]
Former [2013/50]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verwendung einer phosphonsäure- und/oder phosphonsäurederivathaltigen Lösung bei der Entfettung von Metalloberflächen, entfettende Lösung und Verfahren zur Entfettung einer Metalloberfläche[2013/50]
English:Use of a solution containing phosphonic acid and/or phosphonic acid derivatives during the degreasing of metal surfaces, degreasing solution and method for degreasing a metal surface[2013/50]
French:Utilisation d'une solution contenant de l'acide phosphonique et/ou un dérivé d'acide phosphonique au dégraissage de surfaces métalliques, solution dégraissante et procédé de dégraissage d'une surface métallique[2013/50]
Examination procedure09.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/21]
10.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2021Fee for grant paid
25.03.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.03.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.07.2018
Opposition(s)08.02.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
10.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.05.2013
AL05.05.2021
CY05.05.2021
CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
EE05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
MC05.05.2021
MK05.05.2021
MT05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SI05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
TR05.05.2021
IE16.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
GB05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
[2024/41]
Former [2024/29]HU16.05.2013
AL05.05.2021
CY05.05.2021
CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
EE05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
MC05.05.2021
MK05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SI05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
TR05.05.2021
IE16.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
GB05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2024/22]HU16.05.2013
AL05.05.2021
CY05.05.2021
CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
EE05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
MC05.05.2021
MK05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SI05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
IE16.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
GB05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2023/30]HU16.05.2013
AL05.05.2021
CY05.05.2021
CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
EE05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
MC05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SI05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
IE16.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
GB05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2023/29]HU16.05.2013
AL05.05.2021
CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
EE05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
MC05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SI05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
IE16.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
GB05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2022/35]AL05.05.2021
CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
EE05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
MC05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SI05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
IE16.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
GB05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2022/29]AL05.05.2021
CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
EE05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
MC05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SI05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
IE16.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2022/26]AL05.05.2021
CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
EE05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
MC05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
IE16.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2022/23]CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
EE05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
MC05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
IE16.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2022/21]CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
EE05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
MC05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
IE16.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
PT06.09.2021
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/18]CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
EE05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
MC05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
PT06.09.2021
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/10]CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
EE05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
PT06.09.2021
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/09]CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
RO05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SK05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2022/08]CZ05.05.2021
DK05.05.2021
FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
LU16.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2022/07]FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
SM05.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2021/51]FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
RS05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
IS05.09.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2021/50]FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
PT06.09.2021
Former [2021/49]FI05.05.2021
HR05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
LV05.05.2021
SE05.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
NO05.08.2021
GR06.08.2021
Former [2021/47]FI05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
BG05.08.2021
Former [2021/46]FI05.05.2021
LT05.05.2021
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2009033830  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-9 * page 23, paragraph 4 - page 25, paragraph 3 *;
 [X]WO2008122478  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 2, paragraph l - page 3, paragraph 1; examples 1,3; claims 1,5,6,9,11 *;
 [X]EP1310306  (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE1223656  (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) [X] 1-3 * examples 1-11; claims 1-3 *
ExaminationEP0789094
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.