EP2667484 - Rotor and motor including the rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibata, Yoshiyuki c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13168177.7 | 17.05.2013 | [2013/48] | Priority number, date | JP20120120145 | 25.05.2012 Original published format: JP 2012120145 | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2667484 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2667484 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
H02K1/2773 (EP,US);
H02K1/2706 (EP,US);
H02K1/2713 (EP,US);
H02K1/276 (EP,US);
H02K1/2766 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rotor und Motor mit dem Rotor | [2013/48] | English: | Rotor and motor including the rotor | [2013/48] | French: | Rotor et moteur comprenant le rotor | [2013/48] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 16.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2007143335 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1-3 * Paragraphs 14,112,114,115,137;; figures Fig. 25-29 * | by applicant | JP2010233346 |