EP2698054 - Display device for agricultural machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2016/48] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Losch, Michael Neue Wiese 14 a 33775 Versmold / DE | 02 /
Grevinga, Markus Heckenweg 77 48369 Saerbeck / DE | [2014/08] | Application number, filing date | 13168183.5 | 17.05.2013 | [2014/08] | Priority number, date | DE201210107550 | 17.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012107550 | [2014/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2698054 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2698054 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2698054 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/127, G06F3/0485, G06F3/0486, G06F3/0484 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
A01D41/127 (EP,RU,US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/0485 (US);
G06F3/0486 (US);
A01D41/1274 (RU)
|
Former IPC [2014/08] | A01D41/127 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2014/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigenvorrichtung für Landmaschinen | [2014/08] | English: | Display device for agricultural machines | [2014/08] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage pour machines agricoles | [2014/08] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 22.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2013 | AL | 12.07.2017 | CY | 12.07.2017 | CZ | 12.07.2017 | DK | 12.07.2017 | EE | 12.07.2017 | ES | 12.07.2017 | FI | 12.07.2017 | HR | 12.07.2017 | LT | 12.07.2017 | LV | 12.07.2017 | MC | 12.07.2017 | MK | 12.07.2017 | MT | 12.07.2017 | NL | 12.07.2017 | PL | 12.07.2017 | PT | 12.07.2017 | RO | 12.07.2017 | RS | 12.07.2017 | SE | 12.07.2017 | SI | 12.07.2017 | SK | 12.07.2017 | SM | 12.07.2017 | TR | 12.07.2017 | BG | 12.10.2017 | NO | 12.10.2017 | GR | 13.10.2017 | IS | 12.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.05.2013 | |
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.05.2013 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/06] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 12.07.2017 | |
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 12.07.2017 | |
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 12.07.2017 | |
NO | 12.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE10203370 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1* paragraphs [0024] - [0046]; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]EP1650715 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [AD] 1 * paragraphs [0023] - [0037]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2007135977 (MINDEMAN SPENCER L [US]) [X] 1,2,8,28 * paragraphs [0012] - [0032]; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | DE10203370 | EP1650715 |