blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2792990

EP2792990 - Pressure differential bullet advancing structure of toy gun [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.12.2017  [2017/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guay Guay Trading Co., Ltd.
10F., No. 2, Baosheng Road
Yonghe Dist.
New Taipei City 234 / TW
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / LIAO, Yin-Hsi
c/o Alfred Lei
Suite 152, 23 King St.
Cambridge, CB1 1AH / GB
 [2016/01]
Former [2014/43]01 / LIAO, YIN-HSI
c/o Alfred Lei
Suite 152, 23 King St.
Cambridge, CB1 1AH / GB
Representative(s)Horak, Michael
Horak. Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Georgstraße 48
30159 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Horak, Michael
Horak Rechtsanwälte
Georgstrasse 48
30159 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date13168234.617.05.2013
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateTW2013020677815.04.2013         Original published format: TW 102206778
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2792990
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2792990
Date:09.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2016
ClassificationIPC:F41B11/721, F41B11/64
[2014/43]
CPC:
F41B11/64 (EP,US); F41B11/50 (KR); F41B11/60 (US);
A63H33/18 (KR); F41B11/53 (KR); F41B11/721 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Druckdifferenzgeschossförderstruktur für Spielzeugpistole[2014/43]
English:Pressure differential bullet advancing structure of toy gun[2014/43]
French:Structure d'avancement de balle à différentiel de pression pour pistolet jouet[2014/43]
Examination procedure17.05.2013Examination requested  [2014/43]
07.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/49]
10.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time  [2017/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2881752  (BLAHNIK CARL E) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 66; figures 2,4 * [I] 10;
 [XY]US6601780  (SHENG CHIH-SHENG [TW]) [X] 1,3-10 * column 3, line 10 - column 6, line 7; figures 5-13 * [Y] 2;
 [XY]US2010199961  (LIAO SHENG-JEN [TW]) [X] 1,3-6,8-10 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 7;
 [XY]US5778868  (SHEPHERD CHARLES G [CA]) [X] 1,3-6,10 * column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 30; figures 1-4 * [Y] 7;
 [X]US2009178660  (HUANG MU-SUNG [TW]) [X] 1,3,4,8-10 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2008087265  (YEH HSIN-CHENG [TW]) [X] 1,3,4,8-10 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]JPH06235597  (TOKYO MARUI KK) [Y] 2 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.