EP2666547 - Ultrasonic transducer, ultrasonic probe, diagnostic device, and electronic instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuruno, Jiro c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13168240.3 | 17.05.2013 | [2013/48] | Priority number, date | JP20120115321 | 21.05.2012 Original published format: JP 2012115321 | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2666547 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2666547 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/06, A61B8/00 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
B06B1/0607 (EP,US);
A61B8/4494 (US);
B06B1/0629 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/48] | B06B1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ultraschalltransducer, Ultraschallsonde, Diagnosevorrichtung und elektronisches Instrument | [2013/48] | English: | Ultrasonic transducer, ultrasonic probe, diagnostic device, and electronic instrument | [2013/48] | French: | Transducteur à ultrasons, sonde ultrasonique, dispositif de diagnostic et instrument électronique | [2013/48] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 04.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP2006075425 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [YD] 2,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0016] , [0021] , [0050] *; | [Y]US2008013405 (MOON WONKYU [KR], et al) [Y] 3,4,6-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0081] , [0088] *; | [Y]WO2009088307 (ANGELSEN BJOERN A J [NO], et al) [Y] 2,9 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-12 ** page 44, lines 14-27 *; | [IY]US2010327695 (GOEL ATUL [US], et al) [I] 1,2,5,8-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0057] - [0059] * [Y] 2-4,6-9 | by applicant | JP2006075425 |