blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2679163

EP2679163 - Ultrasound image displaying method using marker and ultrasound diagnosis apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.02.2018  [2018/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Medison Co., Ltd.
3366, Hanseo-ro
Nam-myeon
Hongcheon-gun
Gangwon-do 250-870 / KR
[2014/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Jin-yong
3366, Hanseo-ro
Nam-myeon
Hongcheon-gun
Gangwon-do / KR
02 / Lee, Bong-heon
3366, Hanseo-ro
Nam-myeon
Hongcheon-gun
Gangwon-do / KR
03 / Chang, Eun-jung
3366, Hanseo-ro
Nam-myeon
Hongcheon-gun
Gangwon-do / KR
 [2014/01]
Representative(s)Lorenz, Markus
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/01]Lorenz, Markus
Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date13168908.523.05.2013
[2014/01]
Priority number, dateKR2012007023328.06.2012         Original published format: KR 20120070233
[2014/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2679163
Date:01.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2013
ClassificationIPC:A61B8/00, G01S7/52, // A61B8/08
[2014/01]
CPC:
A61B8/463 (EP,US); G06T17/10 (KR); A61B8/00 (KR);
A61B8/13 (US); A61B8/466 (EP,US); A61B8/467 (EP,US);
A61B8/483 (EP,US); A61B8/486 (EP,US); G01S7/52073 (EP,US);
G01S7/52074 (EP,US); A61B8/08 (EP,US); G01S15/8993 (EP,US);
G01S7/52066 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Ultraschallabbildungsanzeigeverfahren mit Marker und Ultraschalldiagnosevorrichtung[2014/01]
English:Ultrasound image displaying method using marker and ultrasound diagnosis apparatus[2014/01]
French:Procédé d'affichage d'image ultrasonore utilisant un marqueur et appareil de diagnostic à ultrasons[2014/01]
Examination procedure30.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
13.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/06]
04.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH06296609  (ISHIHARA KEN, et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,11 * abstract *;
 [X]JP2000014668  (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 1,4-8 *;
 [X]US2004111028  (ABE YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,6,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2007167351  (ALOKA CO LTD) [A] 1-3,5-8,10,11 * abstract ** figures 1,3 *;
 [X]JP2008272033  (GE MED SYS GLOBAL TECH CO LLC) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1-2 *;
 [A]JP2010099259  (ALOKA CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.