EP2805864 - Door leaf device for mass transportation vehicles and method for the production of such a door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vapor Europe S.r.l. A Wabtec Company Viale Regina Pacis, 290 41049 Sassuolo, (MO) / IT | [2014/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matzka, Gerald Römerweg 12/9 2345 Brunn am Gebirge / AT | 02 /
Ritt, Alois Wienerbergersiedlung 7 3300 Amstetten / AT | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | Gross, Felix, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 13169231.1 | 24.05.2013 | [2014/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2805864 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B61D19/00 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
B61D19/02 (EP,US);
E06B3/7015 (US);
E06B2003/7023 (EP,US);
E06B2003/7049 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Türblattvorrichtung für Massentransportfahrzeuge und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer solchen Tür | [2014/48] | English: | Door leaf device for mass transportation vehicles and method for the production of such a door | [2014/48] | French: | Dispositif de battant de porte pour véhicules de transport en commun et procédé pour la production d'une telle porte | [2014/48] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 08.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4372603 (STANCZAK EDMUND A, et al) [A] 1,11 * column 3, lines 29-35; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]DE9106271U (WAGENBAU AMMENDORF) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, lines 17-19; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]EP0773342 (NANYA PLASTICS CORP [TW]) [Y] 1-13 * column 3, lines 36-43; figures 8,9 *; | [A]JPH11240449 (ALNA KOKI KK) [A] 1,11* figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1229206 (RAFI & AMOS LTD [IL]) [A] 1,11 * paragraphs [0015] , [0057]; figure 9a *; | [A]EP1772584 (ZILTEN [FR]) [A] 1,11 * paragraph [0083]; figures 8d, 8e * | by applicant | US4233904 | DE19619212 |