EP2672276 - Use of an electromagnetic speed changing device, such as linear motor or/and eddy current retarder, for speed measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intrasys GmbH Innovative Transport-Systeme Gollierstrasse 70/C 80339 München / DE | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urban, Bernhard Am Anger 8 83539 Pfaffing / DE | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Ruttensperger Lachnit Trossin Gomoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 20 16 55 80016 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | RLTG Ruttensperger Lachnit Trossin Gomoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 20 16 55 80016 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/50] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13169413.5 | 28.05.2013 | [2013/50] | Priority number, date | DE201210209399 | 04.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012209399 | [2013/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2672276 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2672276 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/48, G01P3/487, G01P3/50, G01P3/54, A63G7/00, A63G21/04, B60L15/00, B61L25/02, G01P3/66, G01D5/244, H02K41/02, G01D5/20, G01D5/245, H02P25/06, H02P6/182 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
A63G7/00 (EP);
H02P25/062 (US);
A63G21/04 (EP);
B61L25/021 (EP);
G01D5/2033 (EP);
G01D5/2451 (EP);
G01P3/48 (EP);
G01P3/487 (EP);
G01P3/50 (EP);
G01P3/54 (EP);
G01P3/66 (EP);
H02P25/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/50] | G01P3/48, G01P3/487, G01P3/50, G01P3/54, A63G7/00, A63G21/04, B60L15/00, B61L25/02, G01P3/66, G01D5/244, H02K41/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2013/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung einer elektromagnetischen Geschwindigkeitsänderungsvorrichtung, wie Linearmotor oder/und Wirbelstrombremse, zur Geschwindigkeitsmessung | [2013/50] | English: | Use of an electromagnetic speed changing device, such as linear motor or/and eddy current retarder, for speed measurement | [2013/50] | French: | Utilisation d'un dispositif de modification de la vitesse électromagnétique, tel qu'un moteur linéaire et/ou un frein à courant de Foucault, pour la mesure de la vitesse | [2013/50] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 06.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 07.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2013 | AL | 19.07.2017 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | DK | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | ES | 19.07.2017 | FI | 19.07.2017 | HR | 19.07.2017 | IT | 19.07.2017 | LT | 19.07.2017 | LV | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | MK | 19.07.2017 | MT | 19.07.2017 | PL | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | RS | 19.07.2017 | SE | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | SM | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | NO | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | IS | 19.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.05.2013 | |
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 28.05.2013 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/06] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 19.07.2017 | |
NO | 19.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0684480 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * page 2, line 3 - page 2, line 31 ** page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 7 *; | [Y]DE29705615U (INTRASYS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,11 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 3; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE10135540 (SIEMENS LINEAR MOTOR SYSTEMS G [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0022] , [0023] , [0029]; figures 1,2; claims 1-10 *; | [Y]DE20122389U (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012]; figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]DE102008006305 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0012] , [0013] , [0021] , [0025] , [0030] - [0032] - [0038]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1985345 (ZIERER KARUSSELL UND SPEZIALMA [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] - [0017] - [0020] , [0035] - [0045]; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102008040530 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] - [0027]; figures 2,3 * |