Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021392030 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73893607 | 23.04.2007 | US74532206 | 21.04.2006 | US202117248414 | 25.01.2021 | US53530806 | 26.09.2006 | US53535506 | 26.09.2006 | US201916687966 | 19.11.2019 | US201414341471 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8793679 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2014 | B2 | US2007250829 | 25.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73893607 | 23.04.2007 | US74532206 | 21.04.2006 | US53530806 | 26.09.2006 | US53535506 | 26.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7680754 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2010 | B2 | US2007250621 | 25.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74532206 | 21.04.2006 | US53530806 | 26.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7809817 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2010 | B2 | US2007250615 | 25.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74532206 | 21.04.2006 | US53535506 | 26.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10951459 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2021 | B2 | US2020328930 | 15.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73893607 | 23.04.2007 | US74532206 | 21.04.2006 | US53530806 | 26.09.2006 | US53535506 | 26.09.2006 | US201916687966 | 19.11.2019 | US201414341471 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10523492 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2019 | B2 | US2015081868 | 19.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73893607 | 23.04.2007 | US74532206 | 21.04.2006 | US53530806 | 26.09.2006 | US53535506 | 26.09.2006 | US201414341471 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2011015 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B1 | EP2011015 | 01.09.2010 | A4 | EP2011015 | 07.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74532206 | 21.04.2006 | US53530806 | 26.09.2006 | WO2007CA00675 | 23.04.2007 | US53535506 | 26.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2934343 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2021 | C | CA2934343 | 01.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74532206 | 21.04.2006 | CA2648528 | 23.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2648528 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2016 | C | CA2648528 | 01.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74532206 | 21.04.2006 | US53530806 | 26.09.2006 | WO2007CA00675 | 23.04.2007 | US53535506 | 26.09.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2674872 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2019 | B1 | EP2674872 | 18.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74532206 | 21.04.2006 | US53530806 | 26.09.2006 | WO2007CA00675 | 23.04.2007 | US53535506 | 26.09.2006 | EP07719602 | 23.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007121571 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74532206 | 21.04.2006 | US53530806 | 26.09.2006 | US53535506 | 26.09.2006 | Type | Earlier application | EP2011015 |