EP2695980 - Feeding device for fibers or flocks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oskar Dilo Maschinenfabrik KG Im Hohenend 11 69412 Eberbach / DE | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dilo, Johann Philipp An der Itterbrücke 3 69412 Eberbach / DE | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Wächter, Jochen Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Wächter, Jochen Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Part mbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13170105.4 | 31.05.2013 | [2014/07] | Priority number, date | EP20120179382 | 06.08.2012 Original published format: EP 12179382 | EP20120199616 | 28.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12199616 | EP20120199625 | 28.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12199625 | EP20120199629 | 28.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12199629 | [2014/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695980 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/00, B29C70/30, D04H1/732, D04H1/736, D04H1/74, D01G15/00 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
B29C70/30 (EP,US);
B29C70/305 (EP);
D01G11/02 (EP);
D01G15/00 (EP);
D04H1/732 (EP);
D04H1/736 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zuführvorrichtung für Fasern oder Faserflocken | [2014/07] | English: | Feeding device for fibers or flocks | [2014/07] | French: | Dispositif d'acheminement pour fibres ou flocons | [2014/07] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 12.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2239582 (PLATT INTERNATIONAL LTD) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [A]DD218912 (UNIV DRESDEN TECH [DD]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 20 - line 11; figure 3 *; | [Y]US4586218 (PINTO AKIVA [US]) [Y] 1-8,14,15 * figure . * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 11 * * column 4, lines 3-15 *; | [A]DE4038352 (STAHLECKER FRITZ [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0614740 (LAWTON C A CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, lines 13-55; figure 1 *; | [A]DE10053622 (AKE INNOTECH GMBH AUTOMATISIER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 42-43 * * column 2, lines 4-6 * * column 3, lines 21-24 * * figures 4,5 *; | [Y]EP1437435 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-8,14,15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0052] , [0053]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1486603 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO2009052990 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-3,5-7 * | by applicant | DE2318501 | DE19541818 | US5942175 |