EP2672159 - Device for attaching a tube to a connection nipple [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KE KELIT Kunststoffwerk Gesellschaft m.b.H. Ignaz-Mayer-Strasse 17 4020 Linz / AT | [2016/14] |
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states KE-KELIT Kunststoffwerk Gesellschaft m.b.H. Ignaz-Mayer-Strasse 17 4020 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ratschmann, Elmar Blumenweg 2 4201 Hellmonsödt / AT | 02 /
Linzner, Werner Eschengasse 7 4616 Weißkirchen / AT | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Hübscher & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2014/46] | Patentanwaltzkanzlei Hübscher Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2013/50] | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 13170385.2 | 04.06.2013 | [2013/50] | Priority number, date | AT20120050224 | 06.06.2012 Original published format: AT 502242012 | [2013/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2672159 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2672159 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/207, F16L33/22 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
F16L33/2073 (EP);
F16L33/2071 (AT);
F16L33/227 (EP);
F16L2201/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2013/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anschluss eines Rohres an einem Anschlussnippel | [2013/50] | English: | Device for attaching a tube to a connection nipple | [2013/50] | French: | Dispositif de raccordement d'un tuyau sur un raccord fileté | [2016/19] |
Former [2013/50] | Dispositif de raccordement dýun tuyau sur un raccord fileté | Examination procedure | 05.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 10.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2013 | AL | 11.05.2016 | BG | 11.05.2016 | CY | 11.05.2016 | CZ | 11.05.2016 | DK | 11.05.2016 | EE | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | HR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 11.05.2016 | LT | 11.05.2016 | LV | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | MK | 11.05.2016 | MT | 11.05.2016 | PL | 11.05.2016 | RO | 11.05.2016 | RS | 11.05.2016 | SE | 11.05.2016 | SI | 11.05.2016 | SK | 11.05.2016 | SM | 11.05.2016 | TR | 11.05.2016 | IE | 04.06.2016 | LU | 04.06.2016 | BE | 30.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | FR | 11.07.2016 | NO | 11.08.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | PT | 12.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 04.06.2013 | |
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
LU | 04.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 11.07.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 04.06.2013 | |
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
LU | 04.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 11.07.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.06.2013 | |
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
LU | 04.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 11.07.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.06.2013 | |
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 11.07.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 11.07.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 11.07.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 11.05.2016 | |
NO | 11.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011097658 (KE KELIT KUNSTSTOFFWERK GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1,3-6 * page 4, line 28 - page 6, line 29; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2154411 (KE KELIT KUNSTSTOFFWERK GMBH [AT]) [A] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2246606 (KE KELIT KUNSTSTOFFWERK GMBH [AT]) [A] 2-6 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015]; figure 1.3 * |