EP2810883 - Propylene based terpolymer for containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Soperga, 14/A 20127 Milano / IT | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Destro, Mara Via Azzoguidi, 2 44138 Bologna / IT | 02 /
Ciarafoni, Marco Via Risorgimento 84 44123 Ferrara / IT | 03 /
Massari, Paola Via E. Farolfi 3 44121 Ferrara / IT | 04 /
Caputo, Tiziana via Carlo Mayr 52 44121 Ferrara / IT | 05 /
Böhm, Thomas Händelstrasse 53 64291 Darmstadt / DE | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Sacco, Marco Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [2014/50] | Application number, filing date | 13170720.0 | 06.06.2013 | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2810883 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02, C08F210/06 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
C08F210/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F210/14 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F2500/12 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Propylenbasiertes Terpolymer für Behälter | [2014/50] | English: | Propylene based terpolymer for containers | [2014/50] | French: | Terpolymère à base de propylène pour contenants | [2014/50] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2013 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 19.02.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1495861 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE]) [A] 1-6 * claim 1 ** paragraphs [0021] - [0023] - [0027] *; | [A]WO2009077287 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-6 * claims 1,7,9 * * page 3, line 14 - line 28 * * page 4, line 6 - line 7 *; | [A]WO2012120069 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-6 * claims 1,2 * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 13 *; | [X]WO2013030314 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-6 * claims 1,2,11,12 * * page 12 - page 13; example 1; table 3 * * page 3, line 9 - line 14 * * page 3, line 30 - line 32 * |