EP2682859 - Mobile terminal, image display device and user interface provision method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20 Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2014/02] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. LG Twin Towers, 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Kwontae c/o LG Electronics Inc. Seoul National Univ Research Park San 4-1, Nakseongdae-dong Gwanak-gu, Seoul 151-851 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Youngkeun Intellectual Property Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19-1 Cheongho-ri Jinwi-myeon, Pyeongtaek-si 451-731 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/08] |
Former [2014/02] | 01 /
Lee, Kwontae Intellectual Property Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19-1 Cheongho-ri Jinwi-myeon, Pyeongtaek-si 451-731 Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Youngkeun Intellectual Property Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19-1 Cheongho-ri Jinwi-myeon, Pyeongtaek-si 451-731 Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13170811.7 | 06.06.2013 | [2014/02] | Priority number, date | KR20120073677 | 06.07.2012 Original published format: KR 20120073677 | KR20120082974 | 30.07.2012 Original published format: KR 20120082974 | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2682859 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2682859 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, G06F3/048, G09G5/14, H04N5/262, H04N5/445, H04N5/45, H04N7/18, H04N21/422, G06F1/16, G06F3/038, H04N5/44, H04N21/41, H04N21/414, H04N21/431, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0484 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (US);
G06F1/1694 (EP,US);
G06F3/038 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
G06F3/04842 (EP,US);
G06F3/1454 (EP,US);
G09G5/14 (EP,US);
H04N21/4122 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/42222 (EP,US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N5/2624 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1637 (EP,US);
G06F2203/0384 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04803 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0442 (EP);
G09G2340/0464 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0492 (EP);
G09G2354/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/02] | G06F3/14, G06F3/048, G09G5/14, H04N5/262, H04N5/445, H04N5/45, H04N7/18, H04N21/422 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät, Bildanzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung einer Benutzerschnittstelle damit | [2014/02] | English: | Mobile terminal, image display device and user interface provision method using the same | [2014/02] | French: | Terminal mobile, dispositif d'affichage d'image et procédé de fourniture d'interface utilisateur l'utilisant | [2014/02] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 18.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2020 | 22.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/07] | 24.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.10.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/07] | Divisional application(s) | EP20185410.6 / EP3754483 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003122774 (HARADA TOMOKI [JP]) [Y] 5,6,14,15 * paragraphs [0039] - [0060]; figures 6,8,9 *; | [Y]US2004051719 (FUKUI YOSHIKI [JP], et al) [Y] 7,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0045] , [0052] - [0066] - [0074]; figures 3-6(b) *; | [XY]US2010064260 (AMANO KATSUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraphs [0115] - [0167]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 3-9,12-15; | [XY]US2010162127 (UCHINO SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraphs [0023] - [0067] - [0078] - [0084]; figures 1-5,8,9 * [Y] 3-9,12-15; | [XY]US2011199389 (LU YAN [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraphs [0022] - [0075] - [0091] - [0109] - [0113]; figures 1-3, 6 * [Y] 3-9,12-15; | [Y]US2011244924 (JUNG JONG CHEOL [KR], et al) [Y] 8,15 * paragraphs [0078] , [0117] - [0131]; figures 4-5(f) *; | [Y]US2011316879 (CHIKAHISA YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 4,13 * paragraphs [0011] , [0023] , [0028] , [0033] - [0076] - [0085] , [0093]; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US2012038678 (HWANG JEONSEOP [KR], et al) [Y] 8,9,15 * paragraphs [0257] - [0262]; figures 31,32 ** paragraphs [0116] - [0120] - [0145] - [0152]; figures 4,7 *; | [Y] - "Introduction to MS WINDOWS XP - Mouse, Desktop, Windows, Applications, File handling", (20091231), URL: https://vula.uct.ac.za/web/learnonline/manuals/CET Windows XP Training Manual v1.1.pdf, (20140513), XP055117648 [Y] 3,12 * page 3 * | [Y] - "Chapter 2: Running Programs", Windows XP: The Complete Reference: Running Programs, (20100227), URL: http://delltech.150m.com/XP/running/2.htm, (20140513), XP055117652 [Y] 3,12 * page 1 * | [Y] - "Touchscreen User Manual - ZYTOUCH Driver Software Version 1.0.4 (USB) (For Windows )", (20120430), pages 1 - 38, URL: http://www.zytronic.co.uk/assets/User-Manuals/ZYTOUCH USB v1.0.4 User Manual Issue 1.pdf, (20140513), XP055117654 [Y] 5,6,14,15 * sections 1.8, 4.4, 4.6-4.6.2 * |